EP0211020 - OPHTHALMIC GEL COMPOSITION AND METHOD OF TREATING EYE INFECTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.1991 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.08.1991 [1991/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LEO PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS LTD. A/S (LOVENS KEMISKE FABRIK PRODUKTIONSAKTIESELSKAB) Industriparken 55 2750 Ballerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1987/09] | For all designated states LEO PHARMACEUTICAL PRODUCTS LTD. A/S (LOVENS KEMISKE FABRIK PRODUKTIONSAKTIESELSKAB) Industriparken 55 DK-2750 Ballerup / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DELEURAN, Merete Hoveltsbjergvej DK-3450 Allerod / DK | [1987/09] | Representative(s) | Kinzebach, Werner, et al Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 86 06 49 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/05] | Kinzebach, Werner, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Reitstötter, Kinzebach und Partner Postfach 86 06 49 D-81633 München / DE | ||
Former [1987/09] | Kinzebach, Werner, Dr. Patentanwälte Reitstötter, Kinzebach & Partner Sternwartstrasse 4 Postfach 86 06 49 D-81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86900748.4 | 07.01.1986 | [1987/09] | WO1986DK00002 | Priority number, date | GB19850000310 | 07.01.1985 Original published format: GB 8500310 | [1987/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8603966 | Date: | 17.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0211020 | Date: | 25.02.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0211020 | Date: | 05.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 17.07.1986 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/10, A61K31/575 | [1987/09] | CPC: |
A61K31/575 (EP);
A61K9/0048 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/09] | Title | German: | OPHTHALMISCHE GELZUBEREITUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON AUGENINFEKTIONEN | [1987/09] | English: | OPHTHALMIC GEL COMPOSITION AND METHOD OF TREATING EYE INFECTIONS | [1987/09] | French: | COMPOSITION OPHTALMIQUE COLLOIDALE ET PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT D'INFECTIONS OPHTALMIQUES | [1987/09] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.1986 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.1986 | Examination requested [1987/09] | 08.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.02.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 28.02.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 09.03.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB2013084 (ALCON LAB INC); | [A]DE2654508 (LEO PHARM PROD LTD); | [Y]EP0020794 (TOKO YAKUHIN KOGYO KK); | [Y]FR2407214 (RECH APPLICATIONS THERAP [CH]); | [Y]DK135267B (WARNER LAMBERT CO [US]) | [A] - Remingtons Pharmaceutical sciences, 1975, Easton Pennsylvania, pages 1537-38 | [A] - Rote liste 1977/78 "Item 31005 B, Fucidine." Brit. J. Ophthal Volume 53, No 1, January 1969 A.J. Chadwich and B. Jackson "Intraocular penetration of the antibiotic Fucidin." See pages 26-29. | Examination | - Brit. J. Ophthal Volume 53, No. 1, January 1969 A.J. Chadwich and B.Jackson "Intraocular penetration of the antibiotic Fucidin." See pages 26-29 |