EP0211852 - DEVICE FOR WELDING A CYLINDRICAL PIPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.1990 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tesch, Klaus Dorotheenstrasse 123 D-2000 Hamburg 60 / DE | [1987/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/10] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/10] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 D-80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86900770.8 | 23.01.1986 | [1987/10] | WO1986EP00026 | Priority number, date | DE19850002277U | 29.01.1985 Original published format: DE 8502277 U | DE19853543575 | 10.12.1985 Original published format: DE 3543575 | [1987/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8604281 | Date: | 31.07.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0211852 | Date: | 04.03.1987 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.07.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0211852 | Date: | 11.10.1989 | Language: | DE | [1989/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.07.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B23K9/02 | [1987/10] | CPC: |
B23K9/0286 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/10] | Title | German: | SCHWEISSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN ZYLINDRISCHES ROHR | [1987/10] | English: | DEVICE FOR WELDING A CYLINDRICAL PIPE | [1987/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SOUDAGE D'UN TUYAU CYLINDRIQUE | [1987/10] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.1986 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.1986 | Examination requested [1987/10] | 06.04.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.08.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.04.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | FR1411529 [ ] (METALINOX); | US3722778 [ ] (ROHRBERG R, et al); | DE1615932 [ ] (CONCORDIA SPRECHER SCHALT); | US4347421 [ ] (MUKUDA MUTSUO, et al) |