EP0208759 - MULTISTORY AUTOMATIC GARAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PIETROPAOLI, Paolo Via Campoleone-Ardea 117 04010 Aprilia / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1987/04] | For all designated states PIETROPAOLI, Paolo Via Campoleone-Ardea 117 I-04010 Aprilia / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/04] | Representative(s) | Sarpi, Maurizio Studio Ferrario S.r.l. Via Collina, 36 00187 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | Sarpi, Maurizio Studio Ferrario S.r.l. Via Collina, 36 00187 Roma / IT | ||
Former [1987/04] | Sarpi, Maurizio Studio FERRARIO Via Collina, 36 I-00187 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 86900833.4 | 10.01.1986 | [1987/04] | WO1986IT00004 | Priority number, date | IT19850047537 | 10.01.1985 Original published format: IT 4753785 | [1987/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8604107 | Date: | 17.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0208759 | Date: | 21.01.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0208759 | Date: | 05.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.07.1986 | Classification | IPC: | E04H6/24 | [1987/04] | CPC: |
E04H6/225 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/36] |
Former [1987/04] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHE PARKGARAGE MIT MEHREREN STOCKWERKEN | [1987/04] | English: | MULTISTORY AUTOMATIC GARAGE | [1987/04] | French: | GARAGE AUTOMATIQUE A PLUSIEURS NIVEAUX | [1987/04] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.1986 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.1987 | Examination requested [1987/21] | 14.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 22.02.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 08.03.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 19.01.1987 | M02   Fee paid on   16.03.1987 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.09.1990 | SE | 05.09.1990 | [1991/42] |
Former [1991/27] | SE | 05.09.1990 | Cited in | International search | GB904832 [ ] (FREDERICK GILBERT MITCHELL); | CH453658 [ ] (TOEDTLI SERGEJ D [CH]); | CH505969 [ ] (LESTANG LUCIEN DE [FR]); | EP0016619 [ ] (EATON KENWAY [US]) | Examination | US2714456 |