EP0214158 - ANTHELMINTIC PYRIDINYL ACYLHYDRAZONES, METHOD OF USE AND COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 12.05.1993 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE UPJOHN COMPANY 301 Henrietta Street Kalamazoo Michigan 49001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/12] | For all designated states THE UPJOHN COMPANY 301 Henrietta Street Kalamazoo, Michigan 49001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RECTOR, Douglas, L. 6075 Litchfield Lane Kalamazoo, MI 49009 / US | 02 /
CONDER, George, A. 6835 East "F" Avenue Richland, MI 49083 / US | 03 /
FOLZ, Sylvester, D. 6209 Enola Drive Kalamazoo, MI 49004 / US | [1987/12] | Representative(s) | Perry, Robert Edward, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/12] | Perry, Robert Edward, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 86900935.7 | 23.01.1986 | [1987/12] | WO1986US00072 | Priority number, date | US19850700375 | 11.02.1985 Original published format: US 700375 | US19850715425 | 25.03.1985 Original published format: US 715425 | [1987/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8604582 | Date: | 14.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0214158 | Date: | 18.03.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.08.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C07D213/53, C07D213/89, C07D405/12, C07D405/06, C07D213/61, C07D213/88, C07D213/87, C07D409/12, A01N43/40 | [1987/12] | CPC: |
C07D213/53 (EP);
C07D213/61 (EP);
C07D213/87 (EP);
C07D213/88 (EP);
C07D213/89 (EP);
C07D405/06 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/12] | Title | German: | PYRIDINYL-ACYLHYDRAZONE MIT ANTHELMINTISCHER WIRKUNG, VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN UND ARZNEIMITTEL | [1987/12] | English: | ANTHELMINTIC PYRIDINYL ACYLHYDRAZONES, METHOD OF USE AND COMPOSITIONS | [1987/12] | French: | ACYLHYDRAZONES DE PYRIDINYLE ANTHELMINTIQUES, PROCEDE D'UTILISATION ET COMPOSITIONS | [1987/12] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.1986 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.1986 | Examination requested [1987/12] | 20.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 15.06.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 21.06.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.02.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1993/26] | 12.02.1993 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1993/26] | Request for further processing for: | 21.06.1990 | Request for further processing filed | 21.06.1990 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 19.07.1990 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1993 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]ES324608 ; | US4317776 [ ] (KLAYMAN DANIEL L, et al) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 84, 1976, Columbus, Ohio, (US) F. CAPITAN et al.: "Spectra and Reactivity with Inorganic Ions of 2-Pyridylaldehyde 2-Quinolyhydrazone, 2-Pyridylaldehyde, 2-Quinolylcarbonylhydrazone, and 6-Methyl-2-pyridylaldehyde 2-Quinolylcarbonylhydrazone", see page 481, Abstract No. 11787x & Ars. Pharm. 1975, 16 (2), 293-304 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 67, 1967, Columbus, Ohio, (US), see page 7738, Abstract No. 82098h & ES-A-324608 (E.F. ALVAREZ et al.) 16 December 1966, & ES324608 A 00000000 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 70, 1969, Columbus, Ohio, (US) A.L. MNDZHOYAN et al.: "Furan Derivatives XXXIII.alfa.,beta., and gamma-Pyridinecarboxaldehyde 5- and 4,5-Substituted Furoylhydrazones", see page 267, Abstract No. 11530u & Arm. Khim. Zh. 1968, 21 (4), 340-7 |