EP0248799 - UTILITY WATER DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.1990 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.03.1990 [1990/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vyrmetoder AB Näsbydalsvägen 13 S-183 31 Täby / SE | [1989/08] |
Former [1987/51] | For all designated states REIJONEN, Yrjö Humalniementie 6 A SF-00840 Helsingfors 84 / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reijonen, Yrjö Humalniementie 6A SF-00840 Helsingfors 84 / FI | [1989/08] |
Former [1987/51] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Mrazek, Werner, et al BRANN AB P.O. Box 1344 751 43 Uppsala / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/51] | Mrazek, Werner, et al Dr. Ludwig Brann Patentbyra AB P.O. Box 1344 S-751 43 Uppsala / SE | Application number, filing date | 86901080.1 | 28.01.1986 | [1987/51] | WO1986FI00013 | Priority number, date | FI19850000454 | 04.02.1985 Original published format: FI 850454 | [1987/51] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8604628 | Date: | 14.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0248799 | Date: | 16.12.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0248799 | Date: | 29.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 14.08.1986 | Classification | IPC: | E03B1/02, E03B11/14 | [1987/51] | CPC: |
E03B1/02 (EP);
E03B11/10 (EP);
Y02A20/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, GB, LI, NL, SE [1987/51] | Title | German: | VERTEILUNGSSYSTEM FÜR HAUSHALTSWASSER | [1987/51] | English: | UTILITY WATER DISTRIBUTION SYSTEM | [1987/51] | French: | SYSTEME DE DISTRIBUTION D'EAUX MENAGERES | [1987/51] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 20.08.1986 | Translation filed | 04.08.1987 | National basic fee paid | 04.08.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.08.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.1986 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AT | 04.08.1987 | Examination requested [1987/51] | 27.05.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.09.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]SE371848 (STENBERG FLYGT AB); | [Y]US2614853 (MANNING ROBERT M); | [A]SE392308 (DAHL JORGENSEN H) |