EP0214179 - PROCESSING SEQUENCE CALLS IN A DISTRIBUTED CONTROL SWITCHING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.1991 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.1991 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 14.08.1991 [1991/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1987/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AHMAD, Mahmood 27W364 Oakwood Winfield, IL 60190 / US | 02 /
SAWYER, Albert, Joseph 1106 E. Elm Wheaton, IL 60187 / US | 03 /
SCHREINER, Wayne, Lawrence 1547 London Court Naperville, Illinois 60540 / US | 04 /
THOMAS, Gerald, Harper 6926 Blue Flag Avenue Woodridge, IL 60517 / US | [1987/20] |
Former [1987/12] | 01 /
AHMAD, Mahmood 27W364 Oakwood Winfield, IL 60190 / US | ||
02 /
SAWYER, Albert, Joseph 1106 E. Elm Wheaton, IL 60187 / US | |||
03 /
SCHREINER, Wayne, Lawrence 4615 Douglas Road Oswego, IL 60543 / US | |||
04 /
THOMAS, Gerald, Harper 6926 Blue Flag Avenue Woodridge, IL 60517 / US | Representative(s) | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al Lucent Technologies EUR-IP UK Ltd Unit 18, Core 3 Workzone Innova Business Park Electric Avenue Enfield, EN3 7XB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/32] | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al AT&T (UK) LTD. AT&T Intellectual Property Division 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB | ||
Former [1987/12] | Johnston, Kenneth Graham AT&T (UK) Ltd. 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB | Application number, filing date | 86901211.2 | 05.02.1986 | [1987/12] | WO1986US00182 | Priority number, date | US19850699464 | 07.02.1985 Original published format: US 699464 | [1987/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8604740 | Date: | 14.08.1986 | [1986/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0214179 | Date: | 18.03.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0214179 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.09.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/04 | [1990/26] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0407 (EP,US);
H04Q11/04 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1987/12] | H01Q11/04 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1987/12] | Title | German: | VERARBEITUNG VON FOLGERUFEN IN EINEM VERMITTLUNGSSYSTEM MIT VERTEILTER STEUERUNG | [1987/12] | English: | PROCESSING SEQUENCE CALLS IN A DISTRIBUTED CONTROL SWITCHING SYSTEM | [1987/12] | French: | TRAITEMENT D'APPELS EN SERIE DANS UN SYSTEME DE COMMUTATION A COMMANDE DECENTRALISEE | [1987/12] | Entry into regional phase | 03.10.1986 | National basic fee paid | 03.10.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.1987 | Examination requested [1987/19] | 22.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.12.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 27.06.1990 | SE | 27.06.1990 | [1991/33] |
Former [1991/12] | SE | 27.06.1990 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2371841 (WESCOM SWITCHING [US]); | [A]DE2810245 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]DE2837883 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]US4400587 (TAYLOR MICHAEL P [US], et al); | [A]EP0115786 (REDCOM LAB INC [US]); | [A]EP0125602 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) | [A] - AT & T Technical Journal, No. 1, Part 2, January 1985, New York, (US) W. Densmore et al.: "System 75: Switch services software", pages 197 - 212 | [A] - Philips Telecommunication review, No. 3, September 1984, Hilversum, (NL) H.J. Goebertus: "5ESS-PRX architecture", pages 111 - 131 | [A] - Bell System Technical Journal, volume 61, No. 4, April 1982, Murray Hill, (US) D.W. BROWN et al.: "No 10A remote switching system: host software", pages 491- 524 | [A] - Bell System Technical Journal, volume 62, No. 6, Part 1, July-August 1983, Murray Hill, (US) D.W. BROWN et al.: "Modernization of the suburban ESS: hosting the No. 10A remote switching system", pages 1497 - 1536 | [A] - 5th International Conference on software engineering for Telecommunication switching systems, 4-8 July 1983, Lund, (SE) J. Swerup: "Software architecture in a digital PABX with distributed control", pages 184 - 189 |