Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3666756D1 | 07.12.1989 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US8600196 | 30.01.1986 | US69628685 | 30.01.1985 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4640567 | 03.02.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | US69628685 | 30.01.1985 | US85471986 | 16.04.1986 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO8604744 | Global Dossier | 14.08.1986 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US69628685 | 30.01.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0208778 | Global Dossier | 02.11.1989 | B1 | EP0208778 | 21.01.1987 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US69628685 | 30.01.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS62501594 | 25.06.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | US69628685 | 30.01.1985 |