EP0208778 - DETACHABLE SEALED MULTICONTACT ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.1990 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.10.1990 [1990/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMP INCORPORATED P.O. Box 3608 470 Friendship Road Harrisburg Pennsylvania 17105 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/51] | For all designated states AMP INCORPORATED P.O. Box 3608 470 Friendship Road Harrisburg Pennsylvania 17105 / US | ||
Former [1989/49] | For all designated states AMP INCORPORATED (a New Jersey corporation) P.O. Box 3608 470 Friendship Road Harrisburg Pennsylvania 17105 / US | ||
Former [1989/23] | For all designated states AMP INCORPORATED (a New Jersey corporation) 470 Friendship Road P.O. Box 3608 Harrisburg Pennsylvania 17105 / US | ||
Former [1987/04] | For all designated states AMP INCORPORATED (a New Jersey corporation) P.O. Box 3608 470 Friendship Road Harrisburg Pennsylvania 17105 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUNDERGAN, Robert, Graham 1665 Brookford Road Kernersville, NC 27284 / US | 02 /
McCLUNE, Donald, William P.O. Box 46024, MOUNT CLEMENS MICHIGAN 48046 / US | [1989/44] |
Former [1987/04] | 01 /
LUNDERGAN, Robert, Graham 1665 Brookford Road Kernersville, NC 27284 / US | ||
02 /
McCLUNE, Donald, William 2367 Bethabara, Apt. G-10 Winston-Salem, NC 27106 / US | Representative(s) | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith, London W6 0LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/27] | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | ||
Former [1987/04] | Gray, Robin Oliver BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 86901223.7 | 30.01.1986 | [1987/04] | WO1986US00196 | Priority number, date | US19850696286 | 30.01.1985 Original published format: US 696286 | [1987/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8604744 | Date: | 14.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0208778 | Date: | 21.01.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0208778 | Date: | 02.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.08.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/52 | [1987/04] | CPC: |
H01R13/5221 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1987/04] | Title | German: | DICHTE TRENNBARE ELEKTRISCHE MEHRFACHKONTAKTSTECKVERBINDUNG | [1987/04] | English: | DETACHABLE SEALED MULTICONTACT ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR | [1987/04] | French: | CONNECTEUR ELECTRIQUE SCELLE DETACHABLE MULTICONTACT | [1987/04] | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.1986 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.1986 | Examination requested [1987/04] | 18.04.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 13.04.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 02.05.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US4311355 [ ]; | FR2159701 [ ]; | US3478305 [ ] |