EP0211898 - REDUCIBLE COMPOUNDS AND ANALYTICAL COMPOSITIONS, ELEMENTS AND ME THODS UTILIZING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.1993 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US | ||
Former [1987/10] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY (a New Jersey corporation) 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BELLY, Robert, Troconis 736 Blue Creek Drive Webster, NY 14580 / US | 02 /
MURA, Albert, Joseph 334 Ballard Avenue Rochester, NY 14626 / US | 03 /
ESDERS, Theodore, Walter 741 Sugar Creek Trail Webster, NY 14580 / US | 04 /
BURDICK, Brent, Arthur 30 Flintlock Circle Rochester, NY 14624 / US | [1987/10] | Representative(s) | Nunney, Ronald Frederick Adolphe, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/10] | Nunney, Ronald Frederick Adolphe, et al Kodak Limited Patent Department Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | Application number, filing date | 86901259.1 | 06.02.1986 | [1987/10] | WO1986US00240 | Priority number, date | US19850699386 | 07.02.1985 Original published format: US 699386 | US19860824766 | 31.01.1986 Original published format: US 824766 | [1987/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8604681 | Date: | 14.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0211898 | Date: | 04.03.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0211898 | Date: | 15.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.08.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/52, C12Q1/00, C07C107/00 | [1987/10] | CPC: |
C12Q1/04 (EP,US);
G01N31/22 (EP,US);
G01N33/52 (EP,US);
C12Q2304/26 (EP,US);
Y10S430/159 (EP,US);
Y10S436/903 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, SE [1987/10] | Title | German: | REDUZIERBARE VERBINDUNGEN UND ANALYTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, TESTSTREIFEN UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER VERWENDUNG | [1987/10] | English: | REDUCIBLE COMPOUNDS AND ANALYTICAL COMPOSITIONS, ELEMENTS AND ME THODS UTILIZING SAME | [1987/10] | French: | COMPOSES REDUCTIBLES ET COMPOSITIONS, ELEMENTS ET PROCEDES ANALYTIQUES UTILISANT CES COMPOSES | [1987/10] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.1986 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.1986 | Examination requested [1987/10] | 29.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 28.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 19.09.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 15.04.1992 | [1992/47] | Cited in | International search | [X]JP59166954 ; | EP0131511 [ ] (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]); | EP0049003 [ ] (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]); | EP0004399 [ ] (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]) | [X] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 9, No. 20, (P-330) (1743), 26 January 1985 & JP , A, 59166954 (Konishiroku Shashin Kokyo K.K.) 20 September 1984, & JP59166954 A 19840920 | Examination | EP0015518 | EP0015519 | by applicant | US3415718 | US4199354 | EP0015519 | US4108850 | US4139379 | US4144306 | EP0049003 | EP0131511 | EP0190740 | US3092465 | US3802842 | US3915647 | US3917453 | US3936357 | US4248829 | US4255384 | US4270920 | GB2052057 | US4292272 | US3992158 | US4258001 | US4430436 | US4042335 | USRE30267E | - GUZE ET AL., AM. J. MED. SCI., (196312), pages 691 - 694 |