EP0217821 - EDIBLE HOLOGRAPHIC ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.1992 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.06.1992 [1992/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BEGLEITER, Eric 483 Beacon Street, Apartment No. 95 Boston, MA 02109 / US | [1987/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/16] | Representative(s) | Bass, John Henton, et al REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [1987/16] | Application number, filing date | 86901611.3 | 12.02.1986 | [1987/16] | WO1986US00294 | Priority number, date | US19850708595 | 06.03.1985 Original published format: US 708595 | [1987/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8605071 | Date: | 12.09.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0217821 | Date: | 15.04.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0217821 | Date: | 03.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.09.1986 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A23G3/12, A23G1/22, G03C1/84, G03C5/22, G03C5/24 | [1987/16] | CPC: |
A23G3/50 (EP,US);
A23G3/0252 (EP,US);
A23G3/28 (EP,US);
G03H1/02 (EP,US);
G03H1/0272 (EP,US);
G03H1/0276 (EP,US);
G03H2001/0055 (EP,US);
G03H2001/0284 (EP,US);
G03H2270/10 (EP,US);
G03H2270/52 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1987/44] |
Former [1987/16] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | ESSBARES HOLOGRAPHISCHES ELEMENT | [1987/16] | English: | EDIBLE HOLOGRAPHIC ELEMENT | [1987/16] | French: | ELEMENT HOLOGRAPHIQUE COMESTIBLE | [1987/16] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.1986 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.1986 | Search fee paid | 21.11.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.03.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.02.1987 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 05.03.1987 | Examination requested [1987/19] | 29.04.1987 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, LU, SE | 29.09.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.03.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.12.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.04.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.12.1986 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 08.12.1986 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 08.12.1986 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 08.12.1986 | SE   M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.03.1989 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   21.03.1989 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR326167 (LHOTA THEODOR [FR]); | [X]US4173474 (NISHIDE KATSUHIKO [JP], et al); | [A]WO8101232 (MARVIN GLASS & ASSOCIATES [US]) | International search | [Y]US727435 (PIETZNER CARL); | [A]US3493382 (RYAN JOHN W, et al); | [Y]US4020858 (WILSON INEZ F); | [Y]US4029507 (WEHNER HANS, et al); | [Y]US4200658 (KATZMAN ELLEN F [US], et al); | [Y]US4329409 (WREEDE JOHN E, et al); | [Y]US4330604 (WREEDE JOHN E, et al); | [Y]US4455320 (SYRMIS VICTOR [US]) | Examination | JPH0420858 |