EP0211947 - MICRO DISPLAY MONITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.11.1987 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MICROMEGA CORPORATION 1035 Pearl Street Boulder, CO 80302 / US | [1987/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOOVER, Richard, Brice 7706 Teal Drive, S.W. Huntsville, AL 35802 / US | [1987/10] | Application number, filing date | 86901633.7 | 12.02.1986 | [1987/10] | WO1986US00320 | Priority number, date | US19850700647 | 12.02.1985 Original published format: US 700647 | [1987/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8604692 | Date: | 14.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0211947 | Date: | 04.03.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.08.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G03B15/00, G03B17/48, G03B27/70, G02B21/36 | [1987/10] | CPC: |
G03B17/48 (EP);
G03B15/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/10] | Title | German: | MIKROPROJEKTIONSSCHIRM | [1987/10] | English: | MICRO DISPLAY MONITOR | [1987/10] | French: | MONITEUR DE MICROAFFICHAGE | [1987/10] | File destroyed: | 05.07.1993 | Examination procedure | 14.11.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/01] | 13.07.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1988/01] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.11.1986 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 13.11.1986 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 13.11.1986 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 13.11.1986 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 13.11.1986 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 13.11.1986 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 13.11.1986 | IT   M02   Not yet paid | 13.11.1986 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 13.11.1986 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 13.11.1986 | SE   M02   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 16.02.1987 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4498749 ; | [A]US4453822 ; | [A]US4206966 ; | [A]US3399593 ; | [A]US3334541 ; | [A]US2077809 ; | [A]US1458143 ; | [A]US1161556 ; | [A]US893823 |