EP0214254 - MELATONIN COMPOSITIONS AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.06.1993 [1993/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CELLENA (CELL ENGINEERING) A.G. Lohwisstrasse, 12 CH-8123 Ebmatingen / CH | [1987/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PIERPAOLI, Walter Lohwisstrasse, 12 CH-8123 Ebmatingen / CH | 02 /
REGELSON, William 1402 Confederate Avenue Richmond, VA 23227 / US | [1987/12] | Representative(s) | Gutmann, Ernest, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 3, rue Auber 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/12] | Gutmann, Ernest, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A. 3, rue Chauveau-Lagarde F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 86901842.4 | 03.03.1986 | [1987/12] | WO1986EP00108 | Priority number, date | GB19850005537 | 04.03.1985 Original published format: GB 8505537 | US19850770054 | 27.08.1985 Original published format: US 770054 | [1987/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8605093 | Date: | 12.09.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0214254 | Date: | 18.03.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0214254 | Date: | 17.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.1986 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/06, A61K7/48, A61K31/405 | [1992/25] | CPC: |
A61K8/63 (EP);
A61K8/492 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP);
A61Q7/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1987/12] | A61K7/06, A61K7/48 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/12] | Title | German: | MELATONINHALTIGE MITTEL SOWIE DEREN VERWENDUNGEN | [1987/12] | English: | MELATONIN COMPOSITIONS AND USES THEREOF | [1987/12] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE MELATONINE ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [1987/12] | Entry into regional phase | 30.10.1986 | National basic fee paid | 30.10.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.10.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.1986 | Examination requested [1987/12] | 21.09.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.03.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.11.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 08.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.11.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/23] | Request for further processing for: | 19.03.1991 | Request for further processing filed | 19.03.1991 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.05.1991 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |