EP0223777 - AN OPEN-WIRE INSULATOR AND A METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.11.1987 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAROLON OY Korkeavuorenkatu 1 B SF-00140 Helsinki / FI | [1987/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KARO, Jorma, H. Tehtaankatu 12 C SF-00140 Helsinki / FI | [1987/23] | Application number, filing date | 86901884.6 | 26.03.1986 | [1987/23] | WO1986FI00031 | Priority number, date | FI19850001496 | 15.04.1985 Original published format: FI 851496 | [1987/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8606206 | Date: | 23.10.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0223777 | Date: | 03.06.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 23.10.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H01B17/02, H01B19/00 | [1987/23] | CPC: |
H01B17/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/23] | Title | German: | ISOLATOR FÜR LUFTLINIEN UND DESSEN HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [1987/23] | English: | AN OPEN-WIRE INSULATOR AND A METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF | [1987/23] | French: | ISOLATEUR DE FILS AERIENS ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [1987/23] | File destroyed: | 05.07.1993 | Examination procedure | 16.01.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/01] | 15.06.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1988/01] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.02.1987 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 18.02.1987 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 18.02.1987 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 18.02.1987 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 18.02.1987 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 18.02.1987 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 18.02.1987 | IT   M02   Not yet paid | 18.02.1987 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 18.02.1987 | SE   M02   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 23.04.1987 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2002806 ; | [A]GB831817 ; | [X]DE2227755 ; | [X]FR2005496 ; | [X]US3557447 ; | [A]DE1186922 |