EP0247054 - METAL PILE PLANKS COLD FORMED BY METAL SHEET SHAPING OR BENDING, AND WALLS BUILT FROM SAID PILE PLANKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.1990 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PROFILES ET TUBES DE L'EST Messempré 08110 Carignan / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/49] | For all designated states PROFILES ET TUBES DE L'EST Messempré F-08110 Carignan / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE LATTRE, Jean 72, clos du Prieuré F-57160 Rozerieulles / FR | 02 /
DURMEYER, Jean-Paul Rue du Lac F-57930 Mittersheim / FR | 03 /
DURMEYER, Gérard Route du Pont Neuf F-57930 Mittersheim / FR | [1987/49] | Representative(s) | Degret, Jacques Cabinet Degret 24, place du Général Catroux 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/49] | DEGRET, Jacques Cabinet Degret 24, place du Général Catroux F-75017 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 86901899.4 | 17.03.1986 | [1987/49] | WO1986FR00090 | Priority number, date | FR19850004339 | 15.03.1985 Original published format: FR 8504339 | [1987/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8605532 | Date: | 25.09.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0247054 | Date: | 02.12.1987 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0247054 | Date: | 18.10.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.09.1986 | Classification | IPC: | E02D5/08 | [1987/49] | CPC: |
E02D5/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/49] | Title | German: | METALLSPUNDWANDBOHLEN, KALTGEFORMT DURCH PROFILIERUNG ODER BIEGUNG EINES METALLBLECHES UND WÄNDE, GEBILDET DURCH DIESE BOHLEN | [1987/49] | English: | METAL PILE PLANKS COLD FORMED BY METAL SHEET SHAPING OR BENDING, AND WALLS BUILT FROM SAID PILE PLANKS | [1987/49] | French: | PALPLANCHES METALLIQUES FORMEES A FROID, PAR PROFILAGE OU PAR PLIAGE D'UNE TOLE, ET MURS CONSTITUES A PARTIR DESDITES PALPLANCHES | [1987/49] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 11.09.1987 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.1986 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: BE | 14.09.1987 | Examination requested [1987/49] | 19.12.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.04.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.07.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1988 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   18.05.1988 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.10.1989 | GB | 18.10.1989 | IT | 18.10.1989 | NL | 18.10.1989 | SE | 18.10.1989 | BE | 31.03.1990 | LU | 31.03.1990 | [1999/52] |
Former [1999/42] | AT | 18.10.1989 | |
GB | 18.10.1989 | ||
IT | 18.10.1989 | ||
NL | 18.10.1989 | ||
SE | 18.10.1989 | ||
BE | 31.03.1990 | ||
Former [1997/17] | AT | 18.10.1989 | |
GB | 18.10.1989 | ||
NL | 18.10.1989 | ||
SE | 18.10.1989 | ||
BE | 31.03.1990 | ||
Former [1991/24] | AT | 18.10.1989 | |
GB | 18.10.1989 | ||
NL | 18.10.1989 | ||
SE | 18.10.1989 | ||
BE | 31.03.1990 | ||
Former [1990/42] | AT | 18.10.1989 | |
GB | 18.10.1989 | ||
NL | 18.10.1989 | ||
SE | 18.10.1989 | ||
Former [1990/27] | NL | 18.10.1989 | |
SE | 18.10.1989 | ||
Former [1990/21] | SE | 18.10.1989 | Cited in | International search | DE185650 [ ]; | FR445323 [ ] (HENRI TOUSSAINT [FR]); | FR353692 [ ] (LUTHER PETER FRIESTEDT [US]); | US2249818 [ ] (GIFFORD LESTER R); | FR358472 [ ] (JULIUS RALPH WEMLINGER [US]); | DE507754 [ ] (ENNO BECKER, et al) |