EP0214279 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETECTING CONTAMINATION IN PAPER PULP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 12.06.1990 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.1990 | Change - withdrawal | published on 01.08.1990 [1990/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CARR, Wayne, F. 2229 Palisades Drive Appleton, WI 54915 / US | [1987/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/12] | Representative(s) | Sajda, Wolf E., et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/15] | Sajda, Wolf E., Dipl.-Phys., et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 48 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1987/12] | Sajda, Wolf Eckart, Dipl.-Phys. MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Postfach 86 06 24 D-8000 München 86 / DE | Application number, filing date | 86902124.6 | 05.03.1986 | [1987/12] | WO1986US00465 | Priority number, date | US19850708429 | 05.03.1985 Original published format: US 708429 | [1987/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8605525 | Date: | 25.09.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0214279 | Date: | 18.03.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.09.1986 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | D01D5/02, G01N21/89 | [1987/12] | CPC: |
D21G9/0018 (EP,US);
D21C9/008 (EP,US);
G01N21/94 (EP,US);
G01N33/343 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1987/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM NACHWEIS VON VERUNREINIGUNG IN PAPIERPULPE | [1987/12] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DETECTING CONTAMINATION IN PAPER PULP | [1987/12] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE DETECTION DE CONTAMINANTS DANS DE LA PATE A PAPIER | [1987/12] | File destroyed: | 16.03.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.1986 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.1986 | Search fee paid | 05.11.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.1987 | Examination requested [1987/21] | 07.03.1990 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1990/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1197436 (VOITH GMBH J M); | [A]DE3215067 (SHOWA ELECTRIC WIRE & CABLE CO [JP]); | [A]GB2138574 (BESTOBELL) | International search | [Y]US4225385 (HUGHES JR HORATIO, et al); | [Y]US4318180 (LUNDQVIST INGE J, et al); | [Y]US4342618 (KARNIS ALKIBIADIS, et al); | [Y]US4402604 (NASH PAUL [GB]); | [Y]SU1068811 (VN PROIZV OB CELLJULOSZNO [SU], et al); | [Y]DD213285 (ILMENAU TECH HOCHSCHULE [DD]); | [YP]US4504016 (WIKDAHL NILS A L [SE]); | [YP]US4514257 (KARLSSON HAKAN I [SE], et al) | [Y] - Tappi, Volume 64, No. 7 issued July 1981, by KRUEGER et al "Removing 'Stickies' from Recycled Fiber"see pages 39-41. | [Y] - Paper Trade Journal, issued 01 December 1976, by Inserra, "Finns ready 350 tpd TMP mill, Reportedly First under Computer Controlsee Table 1 page 38. |