EP0219519 - NON-DESTRUCTIVE METHOD FOR DETERMINING AT LEAST ONE POINT OF A CRACKING FRONT IN A PART AND DEVICE FOR IMPLEMENTING SUCH METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.1991 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT | published on 17.07.1991 [1991/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ECOLE CENTRALE DES ARTS ET MANUFACTURES Grande Voie des Vignes F-92290 Chatenay-Malabry / FR | [1987/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOUAMI, Driss J 211 Résidence ECP Appartement 8 Immeuble 38 Agdan Rabat / MA | 02 /
DE VADDER, Daniel 15, rue de Chateaubourg F-91370 Verrières le Buisson / FR | [1987/30] |
Former [1987/18] | 01 /
BOUAMI, Driss J 211 Résidence ECP 2, avenue Sully Prud'homme F-92290 Chatenay Malabry / FR | ||
02 /
DE VADDER, Daniel 15, rue de Chateaubourg F-91370 Verrières le Buisson / FR | Representative(s) | Peuscet, Jacques, et al Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/18] | Peuscet, Jacques, et al SCP Cabinet Peuscet et Autres, 68, rue d'Hauteville F-75010 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 86902419.0 | 15.04.1986 | [1987/18] | WO1986FR00124 | Priority number, date | FR19850005696 | 16.04.1985 Original published format: FR 8505696 | [1987/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8606169 | Date: | 23.10.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0219519 | Date: | 29.04.1987 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0219519 | Date: | 04.07.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.10.1986 | Classification | IPC: | G01N29/04 | [1987/18] | CPC: |
G01N29/262 (EP,US);
G01N29/11 (EP,US);
G01N29/2456 (EP,US);
G01N2291/044 (EP,US);
G01N2291/056 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/18] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ZERSTÖRUNGSFREIEN FESTSTELLUNG VON ZUMINDEST EINEM PUNKT EINER RISSEBILDUNGSVORDERSEITE IN EINEM WERKSTÜCK UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DESSELBEN | [1987/18] | English: | NON-DESTRUCTIVE METHOD FOR DETERMINING AT LEAST ONE POINT OF A CRACKING FRONT IN A PART AND DEVICE FOR IMPLEMENTING SUCH METHOD | [1987/18] | French: | PROCEDE NON DESTRUCTIF POUR DETERMINER AU MOINS UN POINT D'UN FRONT DE FISSURATION DANS UNE PIECE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA MISE EN O EUVRE DU PROCEDE | [1987/18] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.1986 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.1986 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.1986 | Examination requested [1987/18] | 21.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.12.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.07.1990 | SE | 04.07.1990 | [1991/29] |
Former [1991/16] | SE | 04.07.1990 | Cited in | International search | US3332278 [ ] (WOOD FENTON M, et al); | US4292848 [ ] (RAINEY J MONTGOMERY, et al); | US4441369 [ ] (LESSARD DENNIS E [US], et al) | [Y] - Japanese Journal of Applied Physics, Vol. 23, suppl. 23-1, Proceedings of 4th Symposium on Ultrasonic Electronics, 1983, Tokyo (JP) H. NAKAZAWA et al.: 'Ultrasonic Monitoring Techniques of Crack Growth and Fracture Mechanics Evaluation of MAterials', pages 12-16, see page 12 |