EP0252919 - THERMAL VASCULAR DILATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.03.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KANTHAL MEDICAL HEATING AB Äggelundavägen 2 S-175 62 Järfälla / SE | [1988/35] |
Former [1988/03] | For all designated states TEKNIKHUSET SWETRON AB Box 6044 S-175 06 Järfälla / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIL N, Per-Olof Apoteksvägen 20C S-741 00 Knivsta / SE | [1988/03] | Representative(s) | Modin, Jan, et al Ehrner & Delmar Patentbyra AB Box 10316 100 55 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/03] | Modin, Jan, et al c/o Axel Ehrners Patentbyra AB Box 10316 S-100 55 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 86902956.1 | 07.05.1986 | [1988/03] | WO1986SE00215 | Priority number, date | SE19850002248 | 07.05.1985 Original published format: SE 8502248 | [1988/03] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8606622 | Date: | 20.11.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0252919 | Date: | 20.01.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 20.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | A61F7/02, // A61M5/00 | [1988/03] | CPC: |
A61F7/02 (EP,SE,US);
A61F7/007 (EP,SE,US);
A61F2007/0001 (EP,SE,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/03] | Title | German: | THERMISCHER GEFÄSSERWEITERER | [1988/03] | English: | THERMAL VASCULAR DILATOR | [1988/03] | French: | DILATATEUR VASCULAIRE THERMIQUE | [1988/03] | File destroyed: | 21.07.1995 | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.1987 | Translation filed | 28.10.1987 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.1986 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: BE | 28.10.1987 | Examination requested [1988/03] | 20.03.1989 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1989/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE647581 (OTTO SZEPUREK); | [A]FR2297605 (MASTER MEDICAL CORP [US]); | [A]US3178559 (FOGEL MORTIMER A, et al) |