EP0226603 - USE OF TUMOR NECROSIS FACTOR AS A WEIGHT REGULATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.11.1989 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CETUS CORPORATION 1400 Fifty-Third Street Emeryville California 94608 / US | For all designated states THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR UNIVERSITY Encina Hall 105 Stanford University Stanford, California 94305-1850 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/11] | For all designated states CETUS CORPORATION 1400 Fifty-Third Street Emeryville California 94608 / US | ||
For all designated states THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR UNIVERSITY Encina 105 Stanford University Stanford California 94305 / US | |||
Former [1987/27] | For all designated states CETUS CORPORATION 1400 Fifty-Third Street Emeryville California 94608 / US | ||
For all designated states THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR UNIVERSITY 900 Welch Road, Suite 350 Stanford, CA 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LARRICK, James, W. Star Route, Box 48 Woodside, CA 94062 / US | 02 /
RINGOLD, Gordon, M. 2662 South Court Palo Alto, CA 94306 / US | 03 /
MARK, David, F. 217 Stanbridge Court Danville, CA 94526 / US | 04 /
LIN, Leo, S. 40880 Los Pinos Street Fremont, CA 94539 / US | 05 /
TORTI, Frank, M. 3048 Price Court Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | [1987/27] | Representative(s) | Bizley, Richard Edward, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/27] | Bizley, Richard Edward, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 86903084.1 | 01.05.1986 | [1987/27] | WO1986US00952 | Priority number, date | US19850730367 | 02.05.1985 Original published format: US 730367 | US19850801989 | 26.11.1985 Original published format: US 801989 | [1987/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8606280 | Date: | 06.11.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0226603 | Date: | 01.07.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | A61K37/24 | [1987/27] | CPC: |
A61K38/191 (EP,US);
Y10S930/144 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/27] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG DES TUMORNECROSISFAKTORS ALS GEWICHTSREGULATOR | [1987/27] | English: | USE OF TUMOR NECROSIS FACTOR AS A WEIGHT REGULATOR | [1987/27] | French: | UTILISATION DU FACTEUR DE NECROSE DE TUMEURS COMME REGULATEUR DU POIDS | [1987/27] | File destroyed: | 21.07.1995 | Entry into regional phase | 05.01.1987 | National basic fee paid | 05.01.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.01.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.1987 | Examination requested [1987/27] | 27.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 23.02.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 01.03.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/51] | 25.07.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1989/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1989 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US4457916 [ ] (HAYASHI HIROSHI [JP], et al) | [X] - Biological Abstracts/RRM, Volume 28, 1985 Philadelphia, PA (US) NGUYEN LE TRANG et al.: "Isolation and Characterization of Cachectin an Endotoxin-Induced Macrophage Protein that Suppresses Biosynthesis of Anabolic Enzymes", see Abstract 27232 & Reviews of Infectious Diseases (US), 1984, Vol. 6, No. 4, p. 575 | [X] - Biological Abstracts/RRM, Volume 25, 1983 Philadelphia, PA (US) LE TRANG N. et al.: "Isolation and Characterization of Cachectin an Endo Toxin Induced Macrophage Protein which Suppresses the Biosynthesis of Anabolic Enzymes", see Abstract 50425 & Federation Proceedings (USA) 1983, Volume 42, no. 7, Abstract 669 | [XP] - Nature, Volume 316, 8th August 1985 B. BEUTLER et al.: "Identity of Tumour Necrosis Factor and the Macrophage-Secreted Factor Cachectin", pages 552-554, see the whole article | [XP] - Biological Abstracts, Volume 80, 1985 Philadelphia, PA (US) B. BEUTLER et al.: "Purification of Cachectin, a Lipoprotein Lipase-Suppressing Hormone Secreted by Endotoxin-Induced RAW 264.7 Cells" see Abstract 40300 & J. Exp. Med. 161 (5): 984-995, 1985 | [XP] - Biological Abstracts/RRM, Volume 30, Philadelphia, PA (US) A. CERAMI et al.: "Weight Loss Accociated with an Endotoxin-Induced Mediator from Periotoneal Macrophages the Role of Cachectin Tumor Necrosis Factor", see Abstract 76674 & Immunol. Lett. 1985, Vol. 11, No. 3-4 p. 173-178 |