Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] |
30.04.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.06.1992 [1992/25] |
04.07.1990 | Supplementary search report | published on 22.08.1990 [1990/34] |
03.06.1987 | Request for examination filed | published on 22.07.1987 [1987/30] |
23.05.1987 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 08.07.1987 [1987/28] |