EP0227702 - LASER DISPLAY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LUSHER, Mark Edwin Fenn 48 Barcoo Street Roseville, NSW 2069 / AU | For all designated states SAMREIN PTY. LIMITED 402 New South Head Road Double Bay, NSW 2028 / AU | For all designated states McCLOSKEY, Paul Stephen 50 Carters Road Dural, NSW 2158 / AU | [1987/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILLIAMS, Bruce, Gilbert Road Mail Box 820 Via Bungendore, ACT 2621 / AU | 02 /
LANGDOWN, Cecil, William, George 21 Inlander Crescent Flynn, ACT 2615 / AU | 03 /
McCloskey, Paul Stephen 50 Carters Road Dural, NSW 2158 / AU | [1987/28] | Representative(s) | Carmichael, David Andrew Halliday, et al Baron Warren Redfern Redfern House 149/151 Tarring Road Worthing West Sussex BN11 4HE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/28] | Carmichael, David Andrew Halliday, et al G.F. REDFERN & CO. Redfern House 149/151 Tarring Road Worthing West Sussex BN11 4HE / GB | Application number, filing date | 86903149.2 | 29.05.1986 | [1987/28] | WO1986AU00152 | Priority number, date | AU19850000843 | 31.05.1985 Original published format: AU 84385 | AU19850002414 | 13.09.1985 Original published format: AU 241485 | [1987/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8607164 | Date: | 04.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0227702 | Date: | 08.07.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 04.12.1986 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G02B26/10, G09G3/02, G06F9/46 | [1987/28] | CPC: |
G09G3/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/28] | Title | German: | LASERANZEIGESYSTEM | [1987/28] | English: | LASER DISPLAY SYSTEM | [1987/28] | French: | SYSTEME D'AFFICHAGE A LASER | [1987/28] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.1987 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.1987 | Search fee paid | 24.01.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.1987 | Examination requested [1987/30] | 03.12.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/25] | 23.01.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1992/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1989 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   20.10.1989 | 31.05.1991 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4486854 ; | [A]US4003626 ; | [A]US3898627 ; | [A]EP0054490 ; | [A]EP0052755 | [Y] - JOURNAL OF PHYSICS, PART E: SCIENTIFIC INSTRUMENTS, vol. 17, 1984, pages 363-367, The Institute of Physics, Bristol, GB; K.C.A. CRANE et al.: "Microcomputer-controlled scanning of a laser beam at constant speed" | International search | [AP]US4532402 ; | [A]US4213146 ; | [AP]EP0150521 ; | [A]AU196966B | [X] - Journal of Physics, Part E: Scientific Instruments, Volume 17, 1984 (Great Britain), K.C.A. KRANE and J.V. SLERINS 'Microcomputer-Controlled Scanning of a Laser Beam at Constant Speed', pages 363 to 367 |