EP0220294 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR AUTOMATIC SCANNING OF FINGERPRINTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.1991 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.01.1992 [1992/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JYDSK TELEFON A/S Sletvej 30 8310 Arhus / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1987/19] | For all designated states JYDSK TELEFON A/S Sletvej 30 DK-8310 Arhus / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JENSEN, Palle, Rasmus Forhabningsholms Allé 30 DK-1904 Kobenhavn V / DK | [1987/19] | Representative(s) | Ryrlén, J. Evert, et al Awapatent AB Södra Hamngatan 37-41 P.O. Box 11394 S-404 28 Göteborg / SE | [1990/45] |
Former [1987/19] | Ryrlén, J. Evert Awapatent AB Södra Hamngatan 37-41 P.O. Box 11394 S-404 28 Göteborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 86903259.9 | 28.04.1986 | [1987/19] | WO1986DK00044 | Priority number, date | DK19850001984 | 02.05.1985 Original published format: DK 198485 | [1987/19] | Filing language | DA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8606266 | Date: | 06.11.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0220294 | Date: | 06.05.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0220294 | Date: | 16.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/03] | Type: | B1 RE Reissue of patent specification | No.: | EP0220294 | Date: | 11.10.1991 | [1991/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 06.11.1986 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/117 | [1991/03] | CPC: |
A61B5/1172 (EP,US);
A61B5/0531 (EP,US);
G06V40/1335 (EP,US);
G06V40/40 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/19] | A61B5/10 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1987/19] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SELBSTTÄTIGEN ABTASTEN VON FINGERABDRÜCKEN | [1987/19] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR AUTOMATIC SCANNING OF FINGERPRINTS | [1987/19] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL D'ANALYSE AUTOMATIQUE D'EMPREINTES DIGITALES | [1987/19] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.1986 | Translation filed | 31.12.1986 | National basic fee paid | 31.12.1986 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.1987 | Examination requested [1987/27] | 26.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.06.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.10.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US4322163 [ ] (SCHILLER MICHAEL); | DE2056472 [ ] (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO); | EP0045913 [ ] (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | SE321110 [ ] (EBAUCHES SA [CH]) |