|
06.10.1992 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.1992 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.1992 |
Request for change of address of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.1991 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.1991 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.1991 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.1991 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.1991 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.1991 |
Communication concerning signing of documents |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.1991 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.1991 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.08.1991 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.1991 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.1991 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.08.1991 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.07.1991 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.1991 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.04.1991 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.04.1991 |
Description |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
08.04.1991 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.1991 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.02.1991 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
05.02.1991 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.10.1990 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.1990 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
10.09.1990 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.07.1990 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.1990 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.1990 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.07.1990 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.07.1990 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.06.1990 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.06.1990 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.06.1990 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.06.1990 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.04.1990 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.11.1989 |
Communication concerning signing of documents |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.1989 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.1989 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.1989 |
Communication concerning signing of documents |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.1989 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.11.1989 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.11.1989 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.1989 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.1989 |
Late/insufficient payment of the renewal fee without additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.1989 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.06.1989 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.05.1989 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.1988 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.1988 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.1988 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.08.1988 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.1988 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.1988 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.1988 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.1988 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.07.1988 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.1988 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.1988 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.1988 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.1988 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.1988 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.03.1988 |
Subsequently filed documents not duly signed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.1988 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.1988 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.1988 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.1988 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.1988 |
Invitation to pay claims fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.02.1988 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.1987 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.1987 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.11.1987 |
Description |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
25.11.1987 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.1987 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.1987 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.1987 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.1987 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.1987 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.1987 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.11.1987 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.1987 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.1987 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.05.1987 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.05.1987 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.05.1987 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.05.1987 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.1987 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.02.1987 |
Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.12.1986 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.12.1986 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.12.1986 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
11.12.1986 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.12.1986 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
16.06.1986 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |