EP0262130 - DEVICE FOR THE SORPTION, STORAGE AND RELEASE OF HYDROGEN ISOTOPES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.1990 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.07.1990 [1990/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAES GETTERS S.P.A. Via Gallarate, 215 I-20151 Milano / IT | [1988/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTELLI, Daniele Via Massara dei Capitani Rosa, 14 I-20100 Milano / IT | 02 /
DONI, Fabrizio Via Boncompagni, 36 I-20100 Milano / IT | 03 /
BOFFITO, Claudio Via Papa Giovanni XXIII, 2 I-20017 Rho / IT | [1988/14] | Representative(s) | Adorno, Silvano, et al c/o SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.p.A. Via Carducci, 8 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1988/14] | Adorno, Silvano, et al c/o SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.p.A. Via Carducci, 8 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 86903540.2 | 20.05.1986 | [1988/14] | WO1986IT00037 | Priority number, date | IT19850020881 | 24.05.1985 Original published format: IT 2088185 | [1988/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8607044 | Date: | 04.12.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0262130 | Date: | 06.04.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.12.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0262130 | Date: | 02.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.12.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C01B3/00, C01B4/00 | [1988/14] | CPC: |
C01B3/0031 (EP,US);
C01B3/0005 (EP,US);
C01B4/00 (EP,US);
Y02E60/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1988/14] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR SORPTION, SPEICHERUNG UND ABGABE VON WASSERSTOFFISOTOPEN | [1988/14] | English: | DEVICE FOR THE SORPTION, STORAGE AND RELEASE OF HYDROGEN ISOTOPES | [1988/14] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR LA SORPTION, LE STOCKAGE ET LA LIBERATION D'ISOTOPES D'HYDROGENE | [1988/14] | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.1987 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.1986 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: IT | 10.06.1987 | Examination requested [1988/14] | 13.12.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.02.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US4055276 [ ] (SOLOMON DAVID E); | FR2529097 [ ] (GETTERS SPA [IT]) |