Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Event history: EP0266350


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
22.05.2009 Change - representative published on  24.06.2009  [2009/26]
13.04.1991 No opposition filed within time limit published on  05.06.1991 [1991/23]
28.04.1990 (Expected) grant published on  13.06.1990 [1990/24]
14.08.1989 First examination report
26.03.1988 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  11.05.1988 [1988/19]
26.03.1988 Request for examination filed published on  11.05.1988 [1988/19]