blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0266350

EP0266350 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A HIGH-RESISTANCE FIRE DOOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.04.1991
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip22.05.2009Change - representativepublished on 24.06.2009  [2009/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BLOHM + VOSS AG
Hermann-Blohm-Strasse 3
D-2000 Hamburg 11 / DE
[1988/19]
Inventor(s)01 / KRECH, Rolf-Ingo
Reiherstieg 9
D-2123 Barum / DE
02 / MENZEL, Dieter
Geststr. 1
D-4100 Duisburg 74 / DE
[1988/19]
Representative(s)Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB
Hopfenmarkt 33
20457 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/26]Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58
20148 Hamburg / DE
Former [1988/19]Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner
Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62
D-80058 München / DE
Application number, filing date86904139.225.06.1986
[1988/19]
WO1986EP00375
Priority number, dateDE1985352313328.06.1985         Original published format: DE 3523133
[1988/19]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO8700235
Date:15.01.1987
Language:DE
[1987/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0266350
Date:11.05.1988
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1988/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0266350
Date:13.06.1990
Language:DE
[1990/24]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP15.01.1987
ClassificationIPC:E06B5/16
[1988/19]
CPC:
E06B5/16 (EP); E06B2003/7038 (EP)
Designated contracting statesFR,   GB,   NL,   SE [1988/19]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER HOCHWERTIGEN BRANDSCHUTZTÜR[1988/19]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCING A HIGH-RESISTANCE FIRE DOOR[1988/19]
French:PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UNE PORTE COUPE-FEU A HAUTE RESISTANCE[1988/19]
Entry into regional phase02.11.1987National basic fee paid 
02.11.1987Designation fee(s) paid 
02.11.1987Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.01.1987Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: FR
02.11.1987Examination requested  [1988/19]
18.08.1989Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.12.1989Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.02.1990Fee for grant paid
12.02.1990Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.03.1991No opposition filed within time limit [1991/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.06.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
19.06.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational searchAU538681  [ ];
 AU28789  [ ];
 US1416943  [ ] (BROUGHTON WALTER C);
 FR875171  [ ] (BARRE ETS);
 CH419945  [ ] (HEINRICH KROG BAUUNTERNEHMUNG [DE]);
 GB1141066  [ ] (WEYERHAEUSER CO);
 US4015393  [ ] (WARWICK CHARLES HERBERT);
 US4131405  [ ] (MOORE RICHARD L);
 US4343127  [ ] (GREVE DALE R, et al);
 EP0106921  [ ] (CAWM CRETE INTERNATIONAL LIMIT [CA])
ExaminationAU2878971
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.