EP0227787 - PRODUCTION OF INDOLE ALPHA-KETOACIDS FROM ALPHA-AMINOACID, PARTICULARLY OF INDOLEPYRUVIC ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.1991 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.08.1991 [1991/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POLIFARMA S.p.A. Via Tor Sapienza 138 00155 Roma (RM) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1987/28] | For all designated states POLIFARMA S.p.A. Via Tor Sapienza 138 I-00155 Roma (RM) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE LUCA, Giovanna 124 Via Ugo De Carolis I-00136 Roma / IT | 02 /
DI STAZIO, Giovanni 221 Via Clivio di Cinna I-00136 Roma / IT | 03 /
MARGONELLI, Andrea Via G. Massaia, 65 I-00154 Roma / IT | 04 /
MATERAZZI, Mario 10 Via Delleani I-00155 Roma / IT | 05 /
POLITI, Vincenzo 77 Via Albano I-00179 Roma / IT | [1987/28] | Representative(s) | Bazzichelli, Alfredo c/o Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Piazza di Pietra, 39 00186 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1987/28] | Bazzichelli, Alfredo c/o Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A. Piazza di Pietra, 39 I-00186 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 86904336.4 | 24.06.1986 | [1987/28] | WO1986IT00045 | Priority number, date | IT19850048295 | 28.06.1985 Original published format: IT 4829585 | [1987/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8700169 | Date: | 15.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0227787 | Date: | 08.07.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0227787 | Date: | 29.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.01.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C07D209/18 | [1987/28] | CPC: |
C07D209/18 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1987/28] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON INDOL-ALPHA-KETOSÄURE AUS ALPHA-AMINOSÄURE, INSBESONDERE INDOLPYRUVICSÄURE | [1987/28] | English: | PRODUCTION OF INDOLE ALPHA-KETOACIDS FROM ALPHA-AMINOACID, PARTICULARLY OF INDOLEPYRUVIC ACID | [1987/28] | French: | PRODUCTION D'ACIDES ALPHA-INDOLCETONIQUES A PARTIR D'UN ACIDE AMINE ALPHA, NOTAMMENT D'UN ACIDE INDOLPYRUVIQUE | [1987/28] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.1987 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.06.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.06.1987 | Examination requested [1987/41] | 29.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/34] | Request for further processing for: | 11.06.1990 | Request for further processing filed | 11.06.1990 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.06.1990 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | EP0106813 [ ] (POLIFARMA SPA [IT]) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 73, No. 17, 26 October 1970, (Columbus, Ohio, US), T.-T. KUO et al.: "Role of Aminotransferase and Indole-3-Pyruvic Acid in the Synthesis of Indole-3-Acetic Acid in Pseudomonas Savas-Tanoi", see page 36-37, Abstract No. 84102c, & J. Gen. Appl. Microbiol. 1970, 16(3), 191-204 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 69, No. 21, 18 November 1968, (Columbus, Ohio, US), T.C. MOORE et al.: "Synthesis of Indoleacetic Acid from Trytophan via Indolepyruvic Acid in Cell-Free Extracts of pea Seedlings, see page 7860, Abstract No. 84135h, & Arch. Biochem. Biophys. 1968, 127(1-3), 613-21 | Examination | - Chemical Abstracts, volume 73, no 17, 26 October 1970, (Columbus, Ohio, US), T.T. Kuo et al: 'Role of aminotransferase and indole-3-pyruvic acid in the synthesis of indole-3-acetic acid in Pseudomonas savas-tanoi', see pages 36-37, abstract no 8102c |