EP0229151 - A MEANS IN A SOLARIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EXTEND HANDELSHUS AKTIEBOLAG Box 1240 S-701 12 Örebro / SE | [1987/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINDBERG, Jan Ställdalen S-714 00 Kopparberg / SE | [1987/30] | Representative(s) | Lautmann, Kurt O, et al KURT LAUTMANNS PATENTBYRA AB Box 245 691 25 Karlskoga / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/30] | Lautmann, Kurt O., et al KURT LAUTMANNS PATENTBYRA AB Box 245 S-691 25 Karlskoga / SE | Application number, filing date | 86904430.5 | 18.06.1986 | [1987/30] | WO1986SE00294 | Priority number, date | SE19850003258 | 01.07.1985 Original published format: SE 8503258 | [1987/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8700257 | Date: | 15.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0229151 | Date: | 22.07.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 15.01.1987 | Classification | IPC: | F21V21/34, A61N5/06 | [1987/30] | CPC: |
A61N5/0614 (EP,US);
F21S6/00 (EP,US);
F21V17/00 (EP,US);
F21V21/34 (EP,US);
A61N2005/0633 (EP,US);
A61N2005/0634 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL [1987/30] | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG FÜR SONNENBÄDER | [1987/30] | English: | A MEANS IN A SOLARIUM | [1987/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR BAINS DE SOLEIL | [1987/30] | File destroyed: | 24.07.1995 | Entry into regional phase | 20.02.1987 | National basic fee paid | 20.02.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.1987 | Examination requested [1987/30] | 15.06.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.03.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/01] | 07.08.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1990/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [ ] - No relevant documents have been disclosed. |