Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO8700697 | Global Dossier | 29.01.1987 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE8503489 | 16.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU6148686 | Global Dossier | 10.02.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | SE8503489 | 16.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0267192 | Global Dossier | 18.05.1988 | A1 | Priority number | Date | SE8503489 | 16.07.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SE8503489L | 17.01.1987 | L | SE8503489D0 | 16.07.1985 | D0 | Priority number | Date | SE8503489 | 16.07.1985 |