EP0227793 - APPARATUS FOR DISPENSING DOCUMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1987/28] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR IDENTIFYING AND INDICATING THE CONTENT OF DOCUMENT CANISTERS | ||
[1995/40] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.08.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTERBOLD 5995 Mayfair Road, P.O. Box 3091 North Canton Ohio 44720-3091 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/38] | For all designated states InterBold 5995 Mayfair Road, P.O. Box 3091 North Canton, Ohio 44720-3091 / US | ||
Former [1987/28] | For all designated states DIEBOLD, INCORPORATED Post Office Box 8230 Canton, OH 44711 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRAEF, Harry, T. 2058 Timberline Circle NE Massillon, OH 44646 / US | 02 /
NEWTON, Kevin, H. 429 Donner S.W. North Canton, OH 44720 / US | 03 /
ALLISON, Timothy, B. 610 Jeffrey Avenue N.W. Massillon, OH 44646 / US | 04 /
EASTMAN, Jeffrey, M. 7330 Carmen Drive North Canton, OH 44720 / US | [1987/47] |
Former [1987/28] | 01 /
GRAEF, Harry, T. 1752 Oak Trail N.W. Massillon, OH 44646 / US | ||
02 /
NEWTON, Kevin, H. 429 Donner S.W. North Canton, OH 44720 / US | |||
03 /
ALLISON, Timothy, B. 610 Jeffrey Avenue N.W. Massillon, OH 44646 / US | |||
04 /
EASTMAN, Jeffrey, M. 7330 Carmen Drive North Canton, OH 44720 / US | Representative(s) | Saconney, Piero, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1993/01] | Saconney, Piero, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 I-10152 Torino / IT | ||
Former [1987/28] | Buzzi, Franco c/o Jacobacci-Casetta & Perani S.p.A. Via Alfieri, 17 I-10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 86904495.8 | 28.05.1986 | [1987/28] | WO1986US01201 | Priority number, date | US19850749960 | 27.06.1985 Original published format: US 749960 | [1987/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8700154 | Date: | 15.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0227793 | Date: | 08.07.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0227793 | Date: | 04.10.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.01.1987 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B65H1/08, G06F17/40, G06K7/04 | [1995/40] | CPC: |
B65H1/00 (EP);
B65H1/025 (EP);
B65H3/0638 (EP);
B65H3/0676 (EP);
G07D11/12 (EP);
G07D11/237 (EP);
G07F19/20 (EP);
G07F19/201 (EP);
B65H2404/5311 (EP);
B65H2701/1912 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1987/28] | B65H1/08, G06F15/30, G06K7/04 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1987/28] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM AUSGEBEN VON DOKUMENTEN | [1995/40] | English: | APPARATUS FOR DISPENSING DOCUMENTS | [1995/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR DISPENSER DES DOCUMENTS | [1995/40] |
Former [1987/28] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR KENNZEICHNUNG UND ANGABE DES INHALTS VON DOKUMENTBEHÄLTERN | ||
Former [1987/28] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR IDENTIFYING AND INDICATING THE CONTENT OF DOCUMENT CANISTERS | ||
Former [1987/28] | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL D'IDENTIFICATION ET D'INDICATION DU CONTENU DE BOITES DE RANGEMENT DE DOCUMENTS | Miscellaneous | EPB 1996/03: Teilanmeldungen 90112217.6, 91111932.9 | EPB 1996/03: Divisional applications 90112217.6, 91111932.9 | EPB 1996/03: Demandes divisionnaires 90112217.6, 91111932.9 | EPB 1995/41: Teilanmeldungen 90112217.6, 91111932.8 | EPB 1995/41: Divisional applications 90112217.6, 91111932.8 | EPB 1995/41: Demandes divisionnaires 90112217.6, 91111932.8 | EPB 1995/40: Teilanmeldung 90112217.6 eingereicht am 28/05/86 | EPB 1995/40: Divisional application 90112217.6 filed on 28/05/86 | EPB 1995/40: Demande divisionnaire 90112217.6 déposée le 28/05/86 | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.1987 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.1987 | Search fee paid | 21.02.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.1987 | Examination requested [1987/38] | 13.02.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 17.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 17.09.1991 | Appeal received No. T0177/92 | 18.11.1991 | Statement of grounds filed | 29.09.1993 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M05) [1993/40] | 28.02.1994 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1994/09] | 07.02.1995 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | Divisional application(s) | EP90112217.6 / EP0399570 | EP91111932.9 / EP0459529 | EP94100165.3 / EP0600848 | Opposition(s) | 05.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 04.10.1995 | CH | 04.10.1995 | LI | 04.10.1995 | NL | 04.10.1995 | SE | 04.01.1996 | [2003/07] |
Former [1997/13] | BE | 04.10.1995 | |
CH | 04.10.1995 | ||
LI | 04.10.1995 | ||
SE | 04.01.1996 | ||
Former [1996/31] | BE | 04.10.1995 | |
SE | 04.01.1996 | ||
Former [1996/23] | SE | 04.01.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | FR2443405 [ ]; | EP0030413 [ ] | International search | [Y]US3611403 ; | [Y]US4291408 ; | [Y]US4221376 ; | [Y]US4494747 ; | [A]US4016405 ; | [A]US4317957 ; | [A]US4594663 ; | [A]US3914579 ; | [A]US4321672 ; | [A]EP0014312 ; | [A]US3144524 ; | [A]US3308274 ; | [A]US3142816 ; | [A]US2536155 ; | [A]US2919790 ; | [A]JPS56124971 ; | [A]US4337864 ; | [A]GB2039264 ; | [A]US4573606 ; | [A]JPS5826740 ; | [A]US3673389 | Examination | US3665160 | JPS56124971 | JPS5826740 |