EP0232317 - APPARATUS FOR PROVIDING A GROUND REFERENCE FOR TELEPHONE CUSTOMER SPECIAL CIRCUITS POWERED FROM A FLOATING BATTERY FEED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1987/34] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROVIDING A GROUND REFERENCE FOR TELEPHONE CUSTOMER SPECIAL CIRCUITS POWERED FROM A FLOATING BATTERY FEED | ||
[1990/52] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.10.1991 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1987/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROOKS, Kenneth, Lee 988 Creekside Circle Naperville, IL 60540 / US | 02 /
BUFKIN, Paul, Robert 403 Geneva Place Wheaton, IL 60187 / US | 03 /
MIHAL, David, George 5 Robinhood Circle North Oswego, IL 60543 / US | 04 /
MILLER, Jerry, Gorman 908 Lexington Street Wheaton, IL 60187 / US | [1987/34] | Representative(s) | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 0TU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/32] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk, et al AT&T (UK) LTD., AT&T Intellectual Property Division, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green, Essex IG8 0TU / GB | ||
Former [1987/34] | Buckley, Christopher Simon Thirsk AT&T (UK) Ltd. 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex IG8 0TU / GB | Application number, filing date | 86904631.8 | 03.07.1986 | [1987/34] | WO1986US01423 | Priority number, date | US19850761888 | 02.08.1985 Original published format: US 761888 | [1987/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8701004 | Date: | 12.02.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0232317 | Date: | 19.08.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0232317 | Date: | 27.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q1/38, H04M19/00 | [1987/34] | CPC: |
H04Q1/38 (EP,US);
H04M19/001 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1987/34] | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ERDREFERENZ FÜR, DURCH SCHWEBENDE SPEISUNG VERSORGTE BESONDERE TEILNEHMERSCHALTUNGEN | [1990/52] | English: | APPARATUS FOR PROVIDING A GROUND REFERENCE FOR TELEPHONE CUSTOMER SPECIAL CIRCUITS POWERED FROM A FLOATING BATTERY FEED | [1990/52] | French: | APPAREIL D'ETABLISSEMENT D'UNE REFERENCE DE TERRE POUR DES CIRCUITS SPECIAUX TELEPHONIQUES DE CLIENTS ALIMENTES PAR UNE ALIMENTATION A BATTERIE FLOTTANTE | [1990/52] |
Former [1987/34] | VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ERDREFERENZ FÜR, DURCH SCHWEBENDE SPEISUNG VERSORGTE BESONDERE TEILNEHMERSCHALTUNGEN | ||
Former [1987/34] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROVIDING A GROUND REFERENCE FOR TELEPHONE CUSTOMER SPECIAL CIRCUITS POWERED FROM A FLOATING BATTERY FEED | ||
Former [1987/34] | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL D'ETABLISSEMENT D'UNE REFERENCE DE TERRE POUR DES CIRCUITS SPECIAUX TELEPHONIQUES DE CLIENTS ALIMENTES PAR UNE ALIMENTATION A BATTERIE FLOTTANTE | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.1987 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.1987 | Examination requested [1987/39] | 03.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.06.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.08.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 24.08.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 27.12.1990 | CH | 27.12.1990 | LI | 27.12.1990 | NL | 27.12.1990 | SE | 27.12.1990 | [2002/23] |
Former [1991/45] | BE | 27.12.1990 | |
CH | 27.12.1990 | ||
LI | 27.12.1990 | ||
NL | 27.12.1990 | ||
Former [1991/43] | BE | 27.12.1990 | |
CH | 27.12.1990 | ||
LI | 27.12.1990 | ||
Former [1991/39] | BE | 27.12.1990 | Cited in | International search | EP0109705 [ ] (PHILIPS NV [NL]) | [A] - Proceedings of the National Electronics Conference, Volume 35, October 1981, (Oak Brook, Illinois US), FREIMANIS: "Florating Interfaces in Telephone System", pages 25-28 see page 27, right-hand column, line 3 - page 28, left-hand column, line 8 |