blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0230460

EP0230460 - HYDROCARBYL-SUBSTITUTED SUCCINIC ACID AND/OR ANHYDRIDE/AMINE TERMINATED POLY(OXYALKYLENE) REACTION PRODUCTS, AND AQUEOUS SYSTEMS CONTAINING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.06.1991
Database last updated on 30.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip29.06.1991No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.08.1991 [1991/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Lubrizol Corporation
29400 Lakeland Boulevard
Wickliffe, Ohio 44092 / US
[1987/32]
Inventor(s)01 / FORSBERG, John, W.
5625 Dolphin Road
Mentor-On-The-Lake, OH 44060 / US
[1987/32]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1987/32]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Postfach 86 07 67
D-81634 München / DE
Application number, filing date86904721.725.07.1986
[1987/32]
WO1986US01550
Priority number, dateUS1985076019129.07.1985         Original published format: US 760191
[1987/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO8700857
Date:12.02.1987
Language:EN
[1987/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0230460
Date:05.08.1987
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1987/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0230460
Date:29.08.1990
Language:EN
[1990/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.02.1987
ClassificationIPC:C10M173/02, C10M133/16, C10M133/56, C08G65/32
[1987/32]
CPC:
C10M173/02 (EP,US); C10M133/16 (EP,US); C10M133/56 (EP,US);
C10M2201/02 (EP,US); C10M2207/18 (EP,US); C10M2209/104 (EP,US);
C10M2215/04 (EP,US); C10M2215/042 (EP,US); C10M2215/08 (EP,US);
C10M2215/082 (EP,US); C10M2215/086 (EP,US); C10M2215/12 (EP,US);
C10M2215/122 (EP,US); C10M2215/26 (EP,US); C10M2215/28 (EP,US);
C10M2217/046 (EP,US); C10M2217/06 (EP,US); C10M2219/10 (EP,US);
C10M2219/102 (EP,US); C10M2219/104 (EP,US); C10M2219/106 (EP,US);
C10M2223/045 (EP,US); C10N2010/04 (EP,US); C10N2040/08 (EP,US);
C10N2040/22 (EP,US); C10N2050/01 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1987/32]
TitleGerman:REAKTIONSPRODUKTE VON MIT KOHLENWASSERSTOFF SUBSTITUIERTER BERNSTEINSÄURE UND/ODER BERNSTEINSÄUREANHYDRID MIT AMINOENDGRUPPEN ENTHALTENDEN POLYOXYALKYLENEN UND WÄSSRIGE ANLAGEN WELCHE DIESE ENTHALTEN[1987/32]
English:HYDROCARBYL-SUBSTITUTED SUCCINIC ACID AND/OR ANHYDRIDE/AMINE TERMINATED POLY(OXYALKYLENE) REACTION PRODUCTS, AND AQUEOUS SYSTEMS CONTAINING SAME[1987/32]
French:PRODUITS DE REACTION DE L'ACIDE SUCCINIQUE A SUBSTITUTION HYDROCARBYLE ET/OU DU POLY(OXYALKYLENE) A TERMINAISON ANHYDRIDE/AMINE, ET SYSTEME AQUEUX LES CONTENANT[1987/32]
Entry into regional phase25.03.1987National basic fee paid 
25.03.1987Designation fee(s) paid 
11.08.1987Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.08.1987Examination requested  [1987/41]
24.02.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.07.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.10.1989Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.02.1990Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.05.1990Fee for grant paid
11.05.1990Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.05.1991No opposition filed within time limit [1991/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.07.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
11.07.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
21.06.1990Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational searchUS4107061  [ ] (STURWOLD ROBERT J, et al);
 US4151173  [ ] (VOGEL PAUL W [US]);
 GB2024855  [ ] (MOBIL OIL CORP);
 US4239635  [ ] (RIEDER WALTER E [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.