EP0271489 - THERAPEUTIC COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.12.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.02.1991 [1991/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BLASS, David Henry Brook House Cardington, Shropshire SY6 7JZ / GB | [1988/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/25] | Representative(s) | Justitz-Wormser, Daisy Pauline, et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG, Patentanwälte, Postfach 6940 CH-8023 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1988/25] | Justitz-Wormser, Daisy P., Dipl.-Chem., et al Isler & Pedrazzini AG, Patentanwälte, Postfach 6940 CH-8023 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 86904826.4 | 21.08.1986 | [1988/25] | WO1986EP00492 | Priority number, date | GB19850021275 | 27.08.1985 Original published format: GB 8521275 | [1988/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8701285 | Date: | 12.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0271489 | Date: | 22.06.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0271489 | Date: | 28.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.03.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/62, A61K31/45, // (A61K31/455, 31:19) | [1988/25] | CPC: |
A61K31/455 (EP);
A61K31/60 (EP);
A23V2002/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/455, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/455, A61K31/19 (EP);
A61K31/60, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/334 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/25] | Title | German: | THERAPEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [1988/25] | English: | THERAPEUTIC COMPOSITION | [1988/25] | French: | COMPOSITION THERAPEUTIQUE | [1988/25] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.1988 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.1987 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AT | 19.02.1988 | Examination requested [1988/25] | 28.09.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.03.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.09.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | FR4492M [ ]; | US3829569 [ ] (RICE L); | US4120958 [ ] (HUSSAIN ANWAR A) | [X] - Dictionnaire Vidal, 1964, Ovp, Paris (FR) see page 2263 'Vitaspran'; page 1369 'Nicobion Aspirine' |