EP0232356 - PNEUMATIC APPARATUS FOR DRAINING CONDENSATE FROM PRESSURIZED GAS RESERVOIRS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.03.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.05.1990 [1990/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MIULLI, Aldo Via dei Castani 45 L I-00172 Roma / IT | [1987/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/34] | Representative(s) | Massari, Marcello Studio M. Massari S.r.l. 46, Via di Campo Marzio 00186 Roma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1987/34] | Massari, Marcello Studio M. Massari S.r.l. 23, Via Fontanella Borghese I-00186 Roma / IT | Application number, filing date | 86904916.3 | 21.08.1986 | [1987/34] | WO1986IT00066 | Priority number, date | IT19850048490 | 22.08.1985 Original published format: IT 4849085 | [1987/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8701174 | Date: | 26.02.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0232356 | Date: | 19.08.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.02.1987 | Classification | IPC: | F16T1/14, F16T1/00 | [1987/34] | CPC: |
F16T1/00 (EP);
F16T1/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/34] | Title | German: | PNEUMATISCHER KONDENSATABLEITER FÜR DRUCKGASBEHÄLTER | [1987/34] | English: | PNEUMATIC APPARATUS FOR DRAINING CONDENSATE FROM PRESSURIZED GAS RESERVOIRS | [1987/34] | French: | APPAREIL PNEUMATIQUE POUR LE DRAINAGE DU CONDENSAT PROVENANT DE RESERVOIRS DE GAZ PRESSURISES | [1987/34] | File destroyed: | 24.06.1996 | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.1987 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.1987 | Examination requested [1987/44] | 18.04.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/19] | 11.12.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1990/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1988 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.02.1989 | 31.08.1989 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US2732854 [ ]; | US2739605 [ ] (SMITH ROY B); | US2937845 [ ] (LA ROCQUE JOSEPH E, et al); | GB879719 [ ] (WESTINGHOUSE BRAKE & SIGNAL, et al); | FR2082631 [ ] (GEN PNEUMATIC); | US3783889 [ ] (PYLE K); | GB2003258 [ ] (SAB IND AB) |