Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
28.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.03.1993 [1993/11] |
03.12.1992 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 20.01.1993 [1993/03] |
07.02.1992 | (Expected) grant | published on 25.03.1992 [1992/13] |
27.03.1990 | First examination report | |
16.08.1989 | Supplementary search report | published on 04.10.1989 [1989/40] |
20.05.1989 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.07.1989 [1989/27] |
20.05.1989 | Request for examination filed | published on 05.07.1989 [1989/27] |