EP0232410 - LYSIS METHOD AND BUFFER FOR EXTRACTION OF HEPATITIS B SURFACE ANTIGEN FROM YEAST CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.11.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AMGEN INC. 1900 Oak Terrace Lane Thousand Oaks, California 91320 / US | [1992/10] |
Former [1987/34] | For all designated states Amgen 1900 Oak Terrace Lane Thousand Oaks California 91320 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEVINE, Howard, L. 385 Mooncrest Court Newbury Park, CA 91320 / US | 02 /
LEVINE, Mark 4175 Beachmeadow Lane Westlake, CA 91361 / US | [1987/34] | Representative(s) | Brown, John D., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/34] | Brown, John David, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86905526.9 | 15.08.1986 | [1987/34] | WO1986US01704 | Priority number, date | US19850766043 | 15.08.1985 Original published format: US 766043 | [1987/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8701128 | Date: | 26.02.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0232410 | Date: | 19.08.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.02.1987 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/00, A61K39/29, C07K15/04 | [1987/34] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP);
C12N1/063 (EP);
C12N2730/10122 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/34] | Title | German: | SPALTVERFAHREN UND PUFFER ZUR EXTRAKTION VON HEPATITIS-B-OBERFLÄCHENANTIGEN AUS HEFEZELLEN | [1987/34] | English: | LYSIS METHOD AND BUFFER FOR EXTRACTION OF HEPATITIS B SURFACE ANTIGEN FROM YEAST CELLS | [1987/34] | French: | PROCEDE ET TAMPON DE LYSE POUR L'EXTRACTION D'UN ANTIGENE DE SURFACE DE L'HEPATITE B A PARTIR DE CELLULES DE LEVURE | [1987/34] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.1987 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.1987 | Search fee paid | 10.04.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.1987 | Examination requested [1987/42] | 21.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/02] | 20.08.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1992 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP0204680 ; | [Y]EP0110385 ; | [Y]EP0075395 | International search | [X]US3847737 ; | [X]US4113712 ; | [X]US4522809 ; | [XP]US4540533 ; | [XP]US4554157 | [X] - SCHNAITMAN, J. Bacteriol., 108, 545-552, published October 1971. | [Y] - HITZEMAN, Nucleic Acids Res. 11,2745-2763, published May 1983. |