EP0276219 - FEEDING ABRASIVE MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.03.1991 [1991/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE BRITISH HYDROMECHANICS RESEARCH ASSOCIATION Cranfield Bedford MK43 OAJ / GB | [1988/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HERON, Roger, Artindale 3 Church Lane Stagsden Bedfordshire MK43 8SH / GB | 02 /
SAUNDERS, David, Henry 1 Orchard Rise Olney Buckinghamshire MK4 5HB / GB | 03 /
FAIRHURST, Robert, Mark Broadlands 1 Highfield Road Mears Ashby Northampton NN6 0EA / GB | [1988/31] | Representative(s) | Cline, Roger Ledlie, et al EDWARD EVANS BARKER Clifford's Inn, Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/31] | Cline, Roger Ledlie, et al EDWARD EVANS & CO. Chancery House 53-64 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1SD / GB | Application number, filing date | 86905910.5 | 10.10.1986 | [1988/31] | WO1986GB00613 | Priority number, date | GB19850024982 | 10.10.1985 Original published format: GB 8524982 | GB19860003292 | 11.02.1986 Original published format: GB 8603292 | [1988/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8702290 | Date: | 23.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0276219 | Date: | 03.08.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0276219 | Date: | 11.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B24C7/00, B24C1/04 | [1988/31] | CPC: |
B24C1/045 (EP,US);
B24C7/0007 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/31] | Title | German: | SCHLEIFMITTEL-ZUFÜHRUNG | [1988/31] | English: | FEEDING ABRASIVE MATERIAL | [1988/31] | French: | ALIMENTATION EN MATERIAU ABRASIF | [1988/31] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.1988 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.05.1987 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: BE | 07.04.1988 | Examination requested [1988/31] | 19.10.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.04.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.10.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.01.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | DE172545 [ ]; | DE204982 [ ]; | DE399206 [ ] (FRANZ VORISEK); | DE535287 [ ] (BADISCHE MASCHF GMBH, et al); | US2612732 [ ] (ZIEGLER EUGENE R); | US2759266 [ ] (CASSANI RENATO E); | US3084484 [ ] (HALL ROBERT D, et al); | US3514905 [ ] (KING WILLIAM L, et al); | US3577681 [ ] (WAAG NORMAN E); | US3626841 [ ] (SCHACHTER ZVI HARRY); | US3815286 [ ] (PIET M) | by applicant | US3815286 |