EP0241510 - PROCEDURE TO BE PERFORMED IN CONJUNCTION WITH PROTEIN BLOTTING OR NUCLEIC ACID BLOTTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 29.11.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 08.07.2009 [2009/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pharmacia LKB Biotechnology AB 751 82 Uppsala / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/04] | For all designated states Pharmacia LKB Biotechnology AB S-751 82 Uppsala / SE | ||
Former [1987/43] | For all designated states PHARMACIA AB Rapsgatan 7 S-751 82 Uppsala / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EGGERTSEN, Gösta Lindsbergsgatan 6 A S-752 40 Uppsala / SE | [1987/43] | Representative(s) | Widén, Björn Pharmacia & Upjohn AB Patent Department 751 82 Uppsala / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/28] | Widén, Björn Pharmacia & Upjohn AB Patent Department 751 82 Uppsala / SE | ||
Former [1993/04] | Widén, Björn Kabi Pharmacia AB Patent Department S-751 82 Uppsala / SE | Application number, filing date | 86906015.2 | 08.10.1986 | [1987/43] | WO1986SE00461 | Priority number, date | SE19850004666 | 09.10.1985 Original published format: SE 8504666 | [1987/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8702386 | Date: | 23.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0241510 | Date: | 21.10.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0241510 | Date: | 27.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 23.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, G01N33/52, G01N33/558, G01N27/26 | [1987/43] | CPC: |
G01N33/54388 (EP,US);
C12Q1/68 (EP,US);
G01N33/68 (EP,US);
Y10T436/111666 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/43] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG IM ZUSAMMENHANG MIT PROTEIN- ODER NUKLEINSÄUREBLOTTING | [1987/43] | English: | PROCEDURE TO BE PERFORMED IN CONJUNCTION WITH PROTEIN BLOTTING OR NUCLEIC ACID BLOTTING | [1987/43] | French: | PROCEDURE A REALISER LORS DU TRANSFERT DES PROTEINES OU DE L ACIDE NUCLEIQUE PAR L EFFET BUVARD | [1987/43] | Entry into regional phase | 23.05.1987 | National basic fee paid | 23.05.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.1987 | Examination requested [1987/52] | 07.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.05.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.10.1993
24.05.1994
ADMISSIBLE Bachofer GmbH Carl-Zeiss-Strasse 35 D-72770 Reutlingen / DE Opponent's representative Möbus, Rudolf Hindenburgstrasse 65 72762 Reutlingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/50] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.10.1993
24.05.1994
ADMISSIBLE Bachofer GmbH Carl-Zeiss-Strasse 35 D-72770 Reutlingen / DE Opponent's representative Möbus, Rudolf, Dipl.-Ing. Hindenburgstrasse 65 D-72762 Reutlingen / DE | 27.05.1994 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 05.10.1994 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.10.1994 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.1995 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 16.10.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.1996 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 29.08.1996 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1997/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.07.1987 | IT   M02   Fee paid on   03.08.1987 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 27.01.1993 | AT | 08.10.1995 | GB | 08.10.1995 | LU | 08.10.1995 | BE | 31.10.1995 | CH | 31.10.1995 | LI | 31.10.1995 | NL | 01.05.1996 | FR | 28.06.1996 | DE | 02.07.1996 | [2004/38] |
Former [2002/44] | SE | 27.01.1993 | |
AT | 08.10.1995 | ||
GB | 08.10.1995 | ||
BE | 31.10.1995 | ||
CH | 31.10.1995 | ||
LI | 31.10.1995 | ||
LU | 31.10.1995 | ||
NL | 01.05.1996 | ||
FR | 28.06.1996 | ||
DE | 02.07.1996 | ||
Former [2000/06] | SE | 27.01.1993 | |
AT | 08.10.1995 | ||
GB | 08.10.1995 | ||
BE | 31.10.1995 | ||
LU | 31.10.1995 | ||
NL | 01.05.1996 | ||
FR | 28.06.1996 | ||
DE | 02.07.1996 | ||
Former [1997/51] | SE | 27.01.1993 | |
AT | 08.10.1995 | ||
GB | 08.10.1995 | ||
BE | 31.10.1995 | ||
NL | 01.05.1996 | ||
FR | 28.06.1996 | ||
DE | 02.07.1996 | ||
Former [1997/12] | SE | 27.01.1993 | |
AT | 08.10.1995 | ||
GB | 08.10.1995 | ||
BE | 31.10.1995 | ||
FR | 28.06.1996 | ||
DE | 02.07.1996 | ||
Former [1997/03] | SE | 27.01.1993 | |
AT | 08.10.1995 | ||
GB | 08.10.1995 | ||
BE | 31.10.1995 | ||
DE | 02.07.1996 | ||
Former [1996/51] | SE | 27.01.1993 | |
AT | 08.10.1995 | ||
GB | 08.10.1995 | ||
BE | 31.10.1995 | ||
Former [1996/47] | SE | 27.01.1993 | |
AT | 08.10.1995 | ||
GB | 08.10.1995 | ||
Former [1996/42] | SE | 27.01.1993 | |
AT | 08.10.1995 | ||
Former [1993/32] | SE | 27.01.1993 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4279514 (BLUEMEL REINHARD, et al) |