EP0236475 - METHOD OF PREPARING A YEAST-CELL LYTIC ENZYME SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Trustees of Columbia University in the City of New York West 116th Street and Broadway New York New York 10027 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/38] | For all designated states THE TRUSTEES OF COLUMBIA UNIVERSITY IN THE CITY OF NEW YORK West 116th Street and Broadway New York, New York 10027 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASENJO, Juan, A. 224 Vansuan Drive Riveredge, NJ 07661 / US | 02 /
ANDREWS, Barbara, A. 224 Vansuan Drive Riveredge, NJ 07661 / US | [1987/38] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/38] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86906046.7 | 03.09.1986 | [1987/38] | WO1986US01808 | Priority number, date | US19850772363 | 04.09.1985 Original published format: US 772363 | [1987/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8701388 | Date: | 12.03.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0236475 | Date: | 16.09.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.03.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.03.1987 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/24, C12N9/52 | [1987/38] | CPC: |
C12Y302/01039 (EP);
C12N9/244 (EP);
C12N9/52 (EP);
C12Y302/01058 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/38] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES HEFEZELLEN LYSIERENDEN ENZYMSYSTEMS | [1987/38] | English: | METHOD OF PREPARING A YEAST-CELL LYTIC ENZYME SYSTEM | [1987/38] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'UN SYSTEME D'ENZYME LYTIQUE DE CELLULES DE LEVURE | [1987/38] | File destroyed: | 28.01.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.1987 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.1987 | Search fee paid | 12.05.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.09.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.09.1987 | Examination requested [1987/45] | 28.02.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/35] | 23.03.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1990/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.10.1989 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD] - BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING | [XP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS | International search | [XP] - Process Biochemistry, Volume 20, issued October 1985 (Herts, U.K.), (J.A. ASENJO et al), "Microbial Cell Lytic Enzyme Systems: Production and Reaction Kinetics", see pages 158-164see particularly pages 158-160 and 162-164. | [X] - Process Biochemistry, Volume 20, issued October 1985 (Herts, U.K.), (J.A. ASENJO et al), "Microbial Cell Lytic Enzyme Systems: Production and Reaction Kinetics", see pages 158-164see particularly pages 158-160 and 162-164. | [X] - Journal of Bacteriology, Volume 142, issued May, 1980 (Washington, D.C., U.S.A.) (J.H. SCOTT et al), "Lyticase: Endoglucanase and Protease Activities" That Act Together in Yeast Cell Lysis", see pages 414-423, see particularly pages 414-416421 and 422. | [X] - Archives of Biochemistry and Biophysics, Volume 145, issued July, 1971 (Baltimore, Maryland, U.S.A.) (K. KITAMURA et al), "Lysis of Viable Yeast Cells by Enzymes of Arthrobacter Luteus"see pages 402-404. | [T] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 83, No. 3, issued 1975, July 21, (Columbus, Ohio, U.S.A.) (T. OBATA et al) "Production of Yeast Lytic Enzymes by a Strain Belonging to the Genus Oerskovia", see page 251, column 2, the Abstract No. 24853v, Hakko Kogaku Zasshi 1975,53(5)256-63 (Japan). | [Y] - Biotechnology and Bioengineering, Volume 28, issued September, 1986 (New York, New York, U.S.A.) (B.A. ANDREWS et al) "Synthesis and Regulation of Extracellular beta (1-3) Glucanase and Protease by Cytophaga Sp. in Batch and Continuous Culture"see pages 1366-1375. | [ ] - Dissertation Abstracts International B, Volume 41, No. 7, issued January, 1981 (Ann Arbor, Michigan, U.S.A.) (J.H. SCOTT), "Enzymatic Lysis of Yeast Cells"see page 2594. |