EP0247079 - OBSTACLE SURMOUNTING AID FOR TRACKED VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.08.1990 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.10.1990 [1990/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Secretary of State for Defence in Her Britannic Majesty's Gov. of the United Kingdom of Great Britain and Northern Ireland Defence Evaluation & Research Agency Whitehall London SW1A 2HB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/49] | For all designated states The Secretary of State for Defence in Her Britannic Majesty's Government of the United Kingdom of Great Britain and Northern Ireland Whitehall London SW1A 2HB / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GIBSON, Peter, James 110 Nightingale Road Guildford Surrey / GB | 02 /
BEARD, David, Roland 17 Norton Road Camberley Surrey / GB | 03 /
HINCHEY, Christopher, Bancroft 31 Chertsey Road Byfleet Surrey / GB | [1987/49] | Representative(s) | Lockwood, Peter Brian, et al D/IPR1, 7C/2/A31, MOD(PE) Abbey Wood, P.O. Box 702 Bristol BS12 7DU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/49] | Lockwood, Peter Brian, et al Procurement Executive Ministry of Defence Patents 1 A (4) Room 2014, Empress State Building Lillie Road London SW6 1TR / GB | Application number, filing date | 86906395.8 | 27.10.1986 | [1987/49] | WO1986GB00664 | Priority number, date | GB19850026602 | 29.10.1985 Original published format: GB 8526602 | [1987/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8702634 | Date: | 07.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0247079 | Date: | 02.12.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0247079 | Date: | 02.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.05.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B62D55/06, B62D55/075, B62D57/02 | [1987/49] | CPC: |
F16L55/32 (EP,US);
B62D55/108 (KR);
B62D11/20 (EP,US);
B62D53/021 (EP,US);
B62D55/07 (EP,US);
B62D55/075 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1989/45] |
Former [1987/49] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | HILFE ZUR ÜBERWINDUNG EINES HINDERNISSES FÜR KETTENFAHRZEUGE | [1989/44] | English: | OBSTACLE SURMOUNTING AID FOR TRACKED VEHICLE | [1987/49] | French: | APPAREIL POUR AIDER UN VEHICULE A CHENILLES A FRANCHIR DES OBSTACLES | [1987/49] |
Former [1987/49] | HILFE ZUR ÜBERWINDUNG EINES HINDERNISSES FÜR SCHIENENFAHRZEUGE | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.1987 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.1987 | Examination requested [1987/49] | 16.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.04.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.07.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 17.07.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US2878882 [ ] (BERNOTAS RALPH J); | DE675507 [ ] (KONRAD LANGOSCH); | GB1076108 [ ] (DANIEL JOURDAN); | US2012090 [ ] (NICHOLAS STRAUSSLER) |