EP0277136 - AQUATIC AMUSEMENT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.10.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.10.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.12.1991 [1991/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FOTH, István Nystugan S-680 51 Stöllet / SE | [1988/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/32] | Representative(s) | Hynell, Magnus Hynell Patenttjänst AB Patron Carls väg 2 683 40 Hagfors/Uddeholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/32] | Hynell, Magnus Hynell Patenttjänst AB Box 236 S-683 02 Hagfors / SE | Application number, filing date | 86906483.2 | 09.10.1986 | [1988/32] | WO1986SE00463 | Priority number, date | SE19850004705 | 11.10.1985 Original published format: SE 8504705 | US19860865345 | 21.05.1986 Original published format: US 865345 | [1988/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8702264 | Date: | 23.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0277136 | Date: | 10.08.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.04.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0277136 | Date: | 27.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 23.04.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A63G21/18 | [1988/32] | CPC: |
A63G21/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL [1988/32] | Title | German: | WASSERVERGNÜGUNGSANORDNUNG | [1988/32] | English: | AQUATIC AMUSEMENT DEVICE | [1988/32] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DIVERTISSEMENT AQUATIQUE | [1988/32] | Entry into regional phase | 02.04.1988 | National basic fee paid | 02.04.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.04.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.1987 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AT | 02.04.1988 | Examination requested [1988/32] | 19.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.06.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1988 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   11.04.1989 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 27.12.1990 | LI | 27.12.1990 | [1991/43] | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3176982 (OSCAR O'DANIELL); | [Y]US3588098 (STEWART MARK C); | [A]US3618941 (HAYNES BENJAMIN G, et al); | [Y]US3677539 (BENNET MAUREEN CONSTANCE) |