EP0239631 - RECOMBINANT APOLIPOPROTEINS AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIOTECHNOLOGY RESEARCH PARTNERS, LTD. 2450 Bayshore Parkway Mountain View California 94043 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/41] | For all designated states BIOTECHNOLOGY RESEARCH PARTNERS, LTD. 2450 Bayshore Parkway Mountain View California 94043 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PROTTER, Andrew, A. 535 Everett, Apartment 513 Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | 02 /
VIGNE, Jean-Louis 201 Dellbrook Avenue San Francisco, CA 94131 / US | 03 /
MALLORY, Joanne, B. 1537 Flanigan Drive Apartment 130 San Jose, CA 95121 / US | 04 /
TALMADGE, Karen, D. 689 Wildwood Lane Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | 05 /
KANE, John, P. 1490 Marlborough Road Hillsborough, CA 94010 / US | [1987/41] | Representative(s) | Goldin, Douglas Michael J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/41] | Goldin, Douglas Michael J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 86906545.8 | 02.10.1986 | [1987/41] | WO1986US02075 | Priority number, date | US19850784418 | 04.10.1985 Original published format: US 784418 | US19850804692 | 04.12.1985 Original published format: US 804692 | [1987/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8702062 | Date: | 09.04.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0239631 | Date: | 07.10.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.04.1987 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.01.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C12P21/00, C12N15/00, A61K37/02, C07K13/00, C07H17/00 | [1987/41] | CPC: |
C12N15/85 (EP);
A61K31/00 (EP);
C07K14/775 (EP);
C12N15/62 (EP);
C12P21/02 (EP);
C07K2319/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/41] | Title | German: | REKOMBINANTE APOLIPOPROTEINE UND VERFAHREN | [1987/41] | English: | RECOMBINANT APOLIPOPROTEINS AND METHODS | [1987/41] | French: | APOLIPOPROTEINES RECOMBINANTES ET PROCEDES | [1987/41] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.1987 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.1987 | Search fee paid | 09.06.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.1987 | Examination requested [1987/41] | 25.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 25.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.10.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/13] | 03.11.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/13] | Request for further processing for: | 07.05.1993 | Request for further processing filed | 07.05.1993 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.05.1993 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1994 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]WO8604920 ; | [E]WO8702061 ; | [A]EP0173280 | [XP] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, USA, vol. 83, March 1986, pages 1467-1471, Washington, DC, US; A.A. PROTTER et al.: "Isolation of a cDNA clone encoding the amino-terminal region of human apolipoprotein B" | [T] - JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 262, no. 9, March 1987, pages 4241-4247, The American Society of Biological Chemists, Inc., Washington, DC, US; J. BEDNARZ MALLORY et al.: "Expression and characterization of human apolipoprotein A-I in Chinese hamster ovary cells" | [X] - JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 25, no. 10, October 1982, pages 1115-1120, American Chemical Society, Washington, DC, US; R.E. COUNSELL et al.: "Lipoproteins as potential site-specific delivery systems for diagnostic and therapeutic agents" | International search | [Y]US4399216 ; | [Y]US4349629 ; | [YP]US4579821 ; | [Y]US4546082 | [Y] - Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences USA, Volume 81, issued November, 1984. (Washington, D.C. USA) BROSIUS et al "Regulation of Ribosomal RNA Promoters with a Synthetic Lac Operator" pages 6929-6933 see figure 2 and page 6933. | [Y] - Nucleic Acids Research, Volume 12, Number 9, issued 1984 (Oxford, England) SHARPE et al "Human Apolipoproteins AI, AII, CII and CIII, cDNA Sequences and mRNA Abundance pages 3917-3932. see pages 3922-3926. | [Y] - Biochemical and Biophysical Research Communications Volume 123, Number 1. issued 30 August 1984 (New York, New York, USA) MOORE et al "Human Apolipoprotein A-II: Nucleotide Sequence of a Cloned cDNA, and Localization of its Structural Gene on Human Chromosome 1" pages 1-7, see page 4. | [Y] - Journal of Lipid Research. Volume 24. issued 1983 (Bethesda, Maryland, USA) WEINBERG et al "Isolation and Characterization of Human Apolipoprotein A-IV from Lipoprotein-Depleted Serum" pages 52-59, see pages 53-56. | [Y] - Biochemistry Volume 16, Number 16 issued 1977 (Washington, D.C. USA) MAO ett al "Mechanism og Lipid-Protein Interaction in the Plasma Lipoproteins: Lipid-Binding Properties of Synthetic Fragments of Apoliprotein A-II" pages 4150-4156, see pages 4155. | [A] - The Journal of Biological Chemistry Volume 250, Number 18, issued 25 September 1975 (Bethesda, Maryland, USA) JACKSON et al "A Comparative Study on the Removal of Cellular Lipids from Landschutz Ascites Cells by Human Plasma Apolipoproteins" pages 7204-7209. see page 7204. | [Y] - DNA, Volume 3, Number 4, issued, 26, September 1984 (New York, New York, USA) SEILHAMER et al "Isolation and DNA Sequence of Full-Length cDNA and of the Entire Gene for Human Apolipoprotein AI" pages 309-317. see pages 313, 315. | [Y] - Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences, USA, Volume 79. issued November, 1982. (Washington, D.C. USA) BRESLOW et al "Isolation and Characterization of cDNA Clones for Human Apolipoprotein A-I" pages 6861-6865. see page 6861 and figure 3. | [A] - Acta Paediatrica Scandinavica Volume 73 issued 1984 (Stockholm, Sweden) LEVENE et al "A Prospective Study of Intrapulmonary Fat Accumulation in the Newborn Lung Following Intralipid Infusion" pages 454-460. see page 454. | [A] - The Journal of Biological Chemistry volume 260, Number 5 issued 10 March 1985 (Bethesda, Maryland, USA) PARKS et al "Fusion of Low Density Lipoproteins with Cholesterol Ester-Phospholipid Emulsions" pages 3155-3163. see pages 3155, 3160, 3161. | [A] - Molecular and Cellular Biology Volume 4 Number 1 issued Janaury, 1984 (Washington, D.C., USA) McCORMICK et al "Inducible Expression of Amplified beta Interferon Genes in CHO Cells" pages 166-172, see page 166. | [A] - Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences USA Volume 80 issued July, 1983 (Washington, D.C. USA) KARIN et al Expression and Regulation of a Human Metallothionein Gene Carried on an Autonomously Replicating Shuttle Vector" pages 4040-4044, see pages 4040-4041. |