EP0290432 - STORAGE AND TRANSPORTATION OF LIQUID CO 2? [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.1992 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.11.1992 [1992/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PUBGAS INTERNATIONAL PTY. LTD. Jacob's Well Road Alberton, QLD 4207 / AU | [1988/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UREN, Kevin, Russell Unit 8D ''Trafalgar'' Duporth Avenue Maroochydore, QLD 4558 / AU | 02 /
McMULLEN, Clifford, Bernard Lot 5, Lake Morris Road Manunda Cairns, QLD 4870 / AU | 03 /
STARR, Brian 22 Doolooma Street Mooloolaba, QLD 4557 / AU | 04 /
TRONC, Ian, Robert 93 Mortensen Road Nerang, QLD 4211 / AU | [1988/46] | Representative(s) | Downey, William Gerrard, et al Wilson Gunn 5th Floor Blackfriars House The Parsonage Manchester M3 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/46] | Downey, William Gerrard, et al Wilson, Gunn, M'Caw & Co., 41-51 Royal Exchange, Cross Street Manchester M2 7BD / GB | Application number, filing date | 86906724.9 | 19.11.1986 | [1988/46] | WO1986AU00349 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8804007 | Date: | 02.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0290432 | Date: | 17.11.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 02.06.1988 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F17C5/02, F17C7/04, F17C13/00 | [1988/46] | CPC: |
F17C5/02 (EP,US);
F25J1/0027 (EP,US);
F25J1/0204 (EP,US);
F25J1/0275 (EP,US);
F25J1/0294 (EP,US);
F17C2203/03 (EP,US);
F17C2221/013 (EP,US);
F17C2223/0161 (EP,US);
F17C2227/0135 (EP,US);
F17C2227/04 (EP,US);
F17C2270/0171 (EP,US);
F25J2210/90 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/46] | Title | German: | LAGERUNG UND FÖRDERUNG VON FLÜSSIGEM CO2 | [1988/46] | English: | STORAGE AND TRANSPORTATION OF LIQUID CO 2? | [1988/46] | French: | STOCKAGE ET TRANSPORT DE CO 2? LIQUIDE | [1988/46] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.1988 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.1988 | Search fee paid | 05.07.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.1988 | Examination requested [1989/04] | 15.05.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/47] | 02.07.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1992/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.12.1989 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   21.12.1989 | 30.11.1990 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   01.02.1991 | 02.12.1991 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3282305 (ANTOLAK JOHN P); | [A]GB1148062 (BRITISH AIRCRAFT CORP LTD [GB]); | [A]FR2130315 (BIEVER ROBERT); | [A]FR2270513 (LOX EQUIPMENT CY [US]) | International search | [A]DE592298 (LEO I DANA); | [A]DE678986 (PINTSCH JULIUS KG); | [A]DE692326 (PINTSCH JULIUS KG); | [A]DE729345 (PFISTER & LANGHANSS); | [A]US3710584 (LEONARD K); | [A]DE3131311 (AGEFKO KOHLENSAEURE IND [DE]); | [A]SU1160167 (NII T KRIOGENNOGO MASH [SU]); | [A]SU1164507 (SARATOVSKIJ POLT INST [SU]) |