Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Event history: EP0272274


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
23.11.2007 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.12.2007  [2007/52]
17.02.2006 Change - lapse in a contracting state published on  05.04.2006  [2006/14]
03.09.1999 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.10.1999 [1999/42]
12.07.1991 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  04.09.1991 [1991/36]
02.02.1991 No opposition filed within time limit published on  27.03.1991 [1991/13]
27.10.1990 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.12.1990 [1990/50]
24.02.1990 (Expected) grant published on  11.04.1990 [1990/15]
12.06.1989 First examination report
03.06.1988 Change - designated states published on  20.07.1988 [1988/29]
14.05.1988 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  29.06.1988 [1988/26]
14.05.1988 Request for examination filed published on  29.06.1988 [1988/26]