blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0272274

EP0272274 - OPERATION SYSTEM FOR HIGH SPEED TUNNEL TRAINS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.02.1991
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip23.11.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 26.12.2007  [2007/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HIRTZ, Helmut
Alemannenstrasse 7
D-1000 Berlin 28 / DE
[1988/26]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1988/26]
Representative(s)Maikowski, Michael
Patentanwälte
Maikowski & Ninnemann
Postfach 15 09 20
10671 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [1988/26]Maikowski, Michael, Dipl.-Ing. Dr.
Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann Xantener Strasse 10
D-10707 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date86906762.907.11.1986
[1988/26]
WO1986DE00456
Priority number, dateDE1985353978307.11.1985         Original published format: DE 3539783
DE1985354082914.11.1985         Original published format: DE 3540829
[1988/26]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO8702949
Date:21.05.1987
Language:DE
[1987/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0272274
Date:29.06.1988
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.05.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1988/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0272274
Date:11.04.1990
Language:DE
[1990/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.05.1987
ClassificationIPC:B61B13/10, E01B25/12
[1988/26]
CPC:
B61B13/10 (EP,US); E01B25/12 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   SE [1988/29]
Former [1988/26]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  FR,  GB,  IT,  LI,  LU,  NL,  SE 
TitleGerman:BETRIEBSSYSTEM FÜR HOCHGESCHWINDIGKEITSTUNNELBAHNEN[1988/26]
English:OPERATION SYSTEM FOR HIGH SPEED TUNNEL TRAINS[1988/26]
French:SYSTEME D'EXPLOITATION DE VOIES DE TRANSPORT A GRANDE VITESSE DANS DES TUNNELS[1988/26]
Entry into regional phase02.03.1988National basic fee paid 
02.03.1988Designation fee(s) paid 
02.03.1988Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.04.1987Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: BE
02.03.1988Examination requested  [1988/26]
15.06.1989Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
03.10.1989Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.10.1989Fee for grant paid
24.10.1989Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.01.1991No opposition filed within time limit [1991/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.11.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR11.04.1990
IT11.04.1990
SE11.04.1990
[2006/14]
Former [1999/42]IT11.04.1990
SE11.04.1990
FR31.08.1990
Former [1991/36]SE11.04.1990
FR31.08.1990
Former [1990/50]SE11.04.1990
Cited inInternational searchFR1579115  [ ];
 GB1543800  [ ] (JAPAN AIRLINES CO);
 DE3406459  [ ] (PESCHKO FROHFRIED [DE]);
 US3971537  [ ] (WINKLE GUNTHER, et al);
 DE2545336  [ ] (SIEMENS AG)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.