EP0245524 - VITAMIN D 3 DERIVATIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1987/47] | VITAMIN D 3? DERIVATIVE | ||
[1991/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.1992 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TAISHO PHARMACEUTICAL CO. LTD 24-1 Takata 3-chome Toshima-ku Tokyo 171 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1987/47] | For all designated states TAISHO PHARMACEUTICAL CO. LTD 24-1 Takata 3-chome Toshima-ku Tokyo 171 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IKEKAWA, Nobuo 12-5, Kichijyoji Higashi-cho 2-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180 / JP | [1987/47] | Representative(s) | Myerscough, Philip Boyd, et al J.A.KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | [1987/47] | Application number, filing date | 86906944.3 | 21.11.1986 | [1987/47] | WO1986JP00598 | Priority number, date | JP19850261810 | 21.11.1985 Original published format: JP 26181085 | [1987/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8703282 | Date: | 04.06.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0245524 | Date: | 19.11.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.06.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0245524 | Date: | 17.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.06.1987 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07C401/00, A61K31/59 | [1991/16] | CPC: |
C07C401/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1987/47] | C07C172/00, A61K31/59 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/47] | Title | German: | VITAMIN D3-ABKÖMMLING | [1987/47] | English: | VITAMIN D 3 DERIVATIVE | [1991/16] | French: | DERIVE DE LA VITAMINE D 3 | [1991/16] |
Former [1987/47] | VITAMIN D 3? DERIVATIVE | ||
Former [1987/47] | DERIVE DE LA VITAMINE D 3? | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.1987 | Translation filed | 20.07.1987 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.1987 | Search fee paid | 20.07.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.1987 | Examination requested [1987/47] | 30.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.06.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.10.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.04.1991 | BE | 17.04.1991 | NL | 17.04.1991 | SE | 17.04.1991 | LU | 30.11.1991 | [1999/52] |
Former [1992/18] | AT | 17.04.1991 | |
BE | 17.04.1991 | ||
NL | 17.04.1991 | ||
SE | 17.04.1991 | ||
Former [1992/03] | AT | 17.04.1991 | |
NL | 17.04.1991 | ||
SE | 17.04.1991 | ||
Former [1991/48] | SE | 17.04.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, vol. 20, no. 1, January 1977, pages 5-11, Washington, DC, US; R.L. JOHNSON et al.: "Studies on Vitamin D (Calciferol) and its analogues. 10. Side-chain analogues of 25-hydroxyvitamin D31" | International search | [A]JPH05852268 ; | [A]JPS56500296 |