Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE75005T | 15.05.1992 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP86907045 | 23.10.1986 | US80106985 | 22.11.1985 | US8602238 | 23.10.1986 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3684916D1 | 21.05.1992 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US80106985 | 22.11.1985 | US8602238 | 23.10.1986 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IN166450 | 12.05.1990 | B | Priority number | Date | US80106985 | 22.11.1985 | US8602238 | 23.10.1986 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IN169100 | 07.09.1991 | B | Priority number | Date | US80106985 | 22.11.1985 | IN727CA1989 | IN830CA1986 | US8602238 | 23.10.1986 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR880700896 | 13.04.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | US80106985 | 22.11.1985 | US8602238 | 23.10.1986 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4838757 | 13.06.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | US80106985 | 22.11.1985 | US10588587 | 07.10.1987 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO8703340 | Global Dossier | 04.06.1987 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US80106985 | 22.11.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU6729287 | Global Dossier | 01.07.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | US80106985 | 22.11.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0247139 | Global Dossier | 15.04.1992 | B1 | EP0247139 | 02.05.1988 | A4 | EP0247139 | 02.12.1987 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US80106985 | 22.11.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1252392 | 11.04.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | US80106985 | 22.11.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS63502044 | 11.08.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | US80106985 | 22.11.1985 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4715776 | 29.12.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | US80106985 | 22.11.1985 |