EP0250480 - SWINGING BUCKET ROTOR HAVING IMPROVED BUCKET SEATING ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.01.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.01.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.02.1992 [1992/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BECKMAN INSTRUMENTS, INC. 2500 Harbor Boulevard Fullerton, CA 92634 / US | [1988/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHARPLES, Thomas, D. 128 Heather Drive Atherton, CA 94025 / US | 02 /
PIRAMOON, Alireza 3836 Shasta Drive Santa Clara, CA 95991 / US | [1988/01] | Representative(s) | Arthur, John William, et al FITZPATRICKS, 4 West Regent Street Glasgow G2 1RS Scotland / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/45] | Arthur, John William, et al FITZPATRICKS, 4 West Regent Street Glasgow G2 1RS, Scotland / GB | ||
Former [1988/04] | Wotherspoon, Graham FITZPATRICKS 4 West Regent Street Glasgow G2 1RS Scotland / GB | ||
Former [1988/01] | Wotherspoon, Graham FITZPATRICKS 4 West Regent Street Glasgow G2 1RS Scotland / GB | Application number, filing date | 86907046.6 | 23.10.1986 | [1988/01] | WO1986US02240 | Priority number, date | US19850808406 | 11.12.1985 Original published format: US 808406 | [1988/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8703512 | Date: | 18.06.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0250480 | Date: | 07.01.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.06.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0250480 | Date: | 06.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B04B5/04 | [1988/01] | CPC: |
B04B5/0421 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1988/01] | Title | German: | SCHWENKBECHERROTOR MIT BECHERSTÜTZVORRICHTUNG | [1988/01] | English: | SWINGING BUCKET ROTOR HAVING IMPROVED BUCKET SEATING ARRANGEMENT | [1988/01] | French: | ROTOR A GODETS BASCULANTS PRESENTANT UN AGENCEMENT AMELIORE DES SIEGES DE GODETS | [1988/01] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.1987 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.1987 | Examination requested [1988/01] | 22.12.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.08.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.11.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 20.11.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.12.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US4391597 [ ] (PIRAMOON ALIREZA, et al); | DE2608048 [ ] (HERAEUS CHRIST GMBH); | DE2626910 [ ] (HERAEUS CHRIST GMBH); | FR2389415 [ ] (DU PONT [US]) |