EP0243486 - PROGRAMMABLE INTEGRATED CROSSPOINT SWITCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.03.1988 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 4C ELECTRONICS, INC. 9330 Progress Parkway PO Box 868 Mentor Ohio 44060 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/45] | For all designated states 4C ELECTRONICS, INC. 9330 Progress Parkway PO Box 868 Mentor Ohio 44060 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHWARTZ, Rod 1228 Standem Drive Tempe, AZ 85281 / US | 02 /
VENALECK, John, T. 2132 Chimney Ridge Madison, OH 44057 / US | 03 /
BRAUND, Kenneth, W. 9119 Hidden Glen Mentor, OH 44060 / US | [1987/45] | Application number, filing date | 86907065.6 | 27.10.1986 | [1987/45] | WO1986US02295 | Priority number, date | US19850792482 | 29.10.1985 Original published format: US 792482 | [1987/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8702827 | Date: | 07.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0243486 | Date: | 04.11.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.05.1987 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/24, H05K7/10 | [1987/45] | CPC: |
H10B63/80 (EP);
H10N70/245 (EP);
H10N70/826 (EP);
H10N70/884 (EP);
H05K1/0286 (EP);
H05K2201/10212 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/45] | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTER UND PROGRAMMIERBARER KREUZUNGSSCHALTER | [1987/45] | English: | PROGRAMMABLE INTEGRATED CROSSPOINT SWITCH | [1987/45] | French: | COMMUTATEUR DE CROISEMENT INTEGRE ET PROGRAMMABLE | [1987/45] | File destroyed: | 25.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 30.07.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/18] | 16.11.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1988/18] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 29.07.1987 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 29.07.1987 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 29.07.1987 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 29.07.1987 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 29.07.1987 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 29.07.1987 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 29.07.1987 | IT   M02   Not yet paid | 29.07.1987 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 29.07.1987 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 29.07.1987 | SE   M02   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 09.11.1987 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | GB2109158 [ ] (PA MANAGEMENT CONSULT); | EP0117045 [ ] (ENERGY CONVERSION DEVICES INC [US]); | EP0144604 [ ] (ENERGY CONVERSION DEVICES INC [US]); | EP0164949 [ ] (4C ELECTRONICS INC [US]) |