EP0243487 - DEPLOYMENT-RETRACTION APPARATUS FOR AIRCRAFT TURBINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.02.1988 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUNDSTRAND CORPORATION 4751 Harrison Avenue P.O. Box 7003 Rockford, Illinois 61125 / US | [1987/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COHEN, Mordehy 4404 Lori Drive Ãpt. No. 3 Rockford, IL 61111 / US | [2007/32] |
Former [1987/45] | 01 /
COHEN, Mordehy 4404 Lori Drive Apt. No. 3 Rockford, IL 61111 / US | Application number, filing date | 86907072.2 | 29.10.1986 | [1987/45] | WO1986US02310 | Priority number, date | US19850793332 | 31.10.1985 Original published format: US 793332 | [1987/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8702642 | Date: | 07.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0243487 | Date: | 04.11.1987 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1987/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.05.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B64D41/00 | [1987/45] | CPC: |
B64D41/007 (EP);
Y02T50/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/45] | Title | German: | AUS- UND EINKLAPPVORRICHTUNG FÜR FLUGZEUGTURBINEN | [1987/45] | English: | DEPLOYMENT-RETRACTION APPARATUS FOR AIRCRAFT TURBINES | [1987/45] | French: | APPAREIL DE DEPLOIEMENT-RETRACTION POUR DES TURBINES D'AERONEFS | [1987/45] | File destroyed: | 25.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 31.07.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/15] | 10.11.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1988/15] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 30.07.1987 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 30.07.1987 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 30.07.1987 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 30.07.1987 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 30.07.1987 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 30.07.1987 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 30.07.1987 | IT   M02   Not yet paid | 30.07.1987 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 30.07.1987 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 30.07.1987 | SE   M02   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 09.11.1987 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2132682 (HERBERT DOWTY GEORGE); | [Y]US2366121 (FORREST MARTIN-HURST WILLIAM F); | [A]US2667953 (GRISWOLD OWEN H); | [A]US2811137 (HARTEL ERWIN H); | [Y]US2868482 (WESTCOTT JR WILLIAM B); | [A]US3107886 (BOSSLER JR ROBERT B); | [Y]US3149678 (CHILMAN JOHN A, et al); | [A]US3614912 (NEPP DONALD L); | [A]US4024800 (MASCLET JEAN); | [A]US4337912 (WATTON WILLIAM J) |