EP0272276 - SHAPE MEMORY ACTUATOR FOR A MULTI-CONTACT ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.09.2009 [2009/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BETA PHASE INC. 1060 Marsh Road Menlo Park California 94025 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/26] | For all designated states BETA PHASE INC. 1060 Marsh Road Menlo Park California 94025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRUMME, John, F. 87 Upenuf Road Woodside, CA 94062 / US | [1988/26] | Representative(s) | Diehl & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Erika-Mann-Straße 9 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/37] | Diehl & Partner Patentanwälte Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/26] | DIEHL GLAESER HILTL & PARTNER Patentanwälte Postfach 19 03 65 D-80603 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 86907193.6 | 10.11.1986 | [1988/26] | WO1986US02474 | Priority number, date | US19850797652 | 13.11.1985 Original published format: US 797652 | [1988/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8703145 | Date: | 21.05.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0272276 | Date: | 29.06.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.05.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.05.1987 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/20 | [1988/26] | CPC: |
H01R12/856 (EP,US);
H01R4/01 (EP,US);
Y10S439/932 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1988/26] | Title | German: | FORMSPEICHERBETAETIGER FUER MEHRFACHKONTAKT ELEKTRISCHE VERBINDUNGSSTELLE | [1988/26] | English: | SHAPE MEMORY ACTUATOR FOR A MULTI-CONTACT ELECTRICAL CONNECTOR | [1988/26] | French: | ACTUATEUR DE MEMOIRE DE FORME POUR UN CONNECTEUR ELECTRIQUE MULTICONTACTS | [1988/26] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.1987 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.1987 | Search fee paid | 13.07.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/26] | 11.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.10.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/19] | 04.12.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.12.1991 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2189852 (RAYCHEM CORP [US]); | [Y]EP0112618 (RAYCHEM CORP [US]); | [A]EP0081372 (RAYCHEM CORP [US]) | International search | [AE]US4643500 (KRUMME JOHN F [US]); | [Y]US3727173 (GOLDMANN L, et al); | [Y]US3861030 (OTTE RICHARD F, et al); | [Y]US3913444 (OTTE RICHARD F); | [A]US4221457 (ALLEN LESLIE J, et al); | [A]US4548456 (ROBERTSON JOHN A [GB]); | [AP]US4553803 (LAPRAIK SCOTT J [US], et al); | [AP]US4611870 (BEERS HOWARD L [US]); | [AP]US4621882 (KRUMME JOHN F [US]); | [A]DE2802779 (RAYCHEM LTD); | [A]JPH05453288 |